EP3257578 - PREPARATION PROCESS OF FUNCTIONALIZED SUPERPARAMAGNETIC ADSORBENTS WITH DIPHENYLDIMETHOXYSILANE (DPDMS) AS PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, GR | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univerza v Mariboru Fakulteta za strojnistvo Smetanova 17 2000 Maribor / SI | For all designated states IOS, Institut za okoljevarstvo in senzorje, d.o.o. Beloruska ulica 7 2000 Maribor / SI | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosak, Aljosa Pod gabri 3 3000 Celje / SI | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
Lobnik, Aleksandra Strma ulica 16 2311 Hoce / SI | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Flak, Antonija Patentni biro AF d.o.o. Kotnikova 32 p.p. 2706 1001 Ljubljana / SI | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16207124.5 | 28.12.2016 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | SI20160000146 | 15.06.2016 Original published format: SI 201600146 | [2017/51] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3257578 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3257578 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28, B01J20/06, B01J20/30, B01J20/32, B01J20/10, C02F1/68 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
B01J20/103 (EP);
B01D17/0202 (EP);
B01J20/06 (EP);
B01J20/28009 (EP);
B01J20/28059 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3257 (EP);
B01J20/3261 (EP);
B01J20/3293 (EP);
C02F1/288 (EP);
C02F1/681 (EP);
C02F1/281 (EP);
C02F1/488 (EP);
C02F2101/32 (EP);
C02F2103/007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUPERPARAMAGNETISCHEN ABSORBERN HERGESTELLT MIT DIPHENYLDIMETHOXYSILAN (DPDMS) | [2017/51] | English: | PREPARATION PROCESS OF FUNCTIONALIZED SUPERPARAMAGNETIC ADSORBENTS WITH DIPHENYLDIMETHOXYSILANE (DPDMS) AS PRECURSOR | [2017/51] | French: | PROCÉDE DE PRÉPARATON D'ADSORBANTS SUPERPARAMAGNÉTIQUES AVEC DIPHENYLDIMETHOXYSILANE (DPDMS) COMME PRÉCURSEUR | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2016 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | GB | 28.12.2020 | IE | 28.12.2020 | LU | 28.12.2020 | SI | 29.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 28.12.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
SI | 29.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.12.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
SI | 29.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
SI | 29.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012064448 (SAKAMOTO MUNEYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 6-9 * §[0051-0052, 0075] *; | [IA] - VILTUZNIK BRANKA ET AL, "Removal of Pb(II) ions from aqueous systems using thiol-functionalized cobalt-ferrite magnetic nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 68, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S10971-013-3072-Z, ISSN 0928-0707, (20130530), pages 365 - 373, (20130530), XP035374753 [I] 6-9 * Point 2.1, page 366. * [A] 1-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10971-013-3072-z | [I] - KRAUS A ET AL, "Synthesis of MPTS-modified cobalt ferrite nanoparticles and their adsorption properties in relation to Au(III)", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS,INC, US, vol. 338, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JCIS.2009.06.045, ISSN 0021-9797, (20091015), pages 359 - 365, (20090623), XP026501840 [I] 6-9 * Points 2.1-2.4, page 360. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2009.06.045 | [I] - KIM YOUNG-KEE ET AL, "Use of magnetic nanoparticles to enhance bioethanol production in syngas fermentation", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, GB, (20160107), vol. 204, doi:10.1016/J.BIORTECH.2016.01.001, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 139 - 144, XP029398440 [I] 6-9 * Page 140, points 2.1-2.2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2016.01.001 | Examination | - Y. PEI ET AL, "Fabrication and characterisation of hydrophobic magnetite composite nanoparticles for oil/water separation", MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY: ADVANCED PERFORMANCE MATERIALS, UK, (20150504), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1179/1753555715Y.0000000024, ISSN 1066-7857, pages 38 - 43, XP055403442 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/1753555715Y.0000000024 | by applicant | WO2013076742 | - "Fast and selective removal of oils from water surface via highly hydrophobic Core-Shell Fe 0 @C nanoparticles under magnetic field", ZHU ET AL., journal ACS Applied Materials & Interfaces, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 2, pages 3141 - 6 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Synthesis and characterization of superhydrophobic and superparamagnetic film based on maghemite-polystyrene composite", JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 259, pages 719 - 725 | - ZHU ET AL., JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 258, no. 17, pages 6326 - 6330 | - GU ET AL., "Facile removal of oils from water surfaces through highly hydrophobic and magnetic polymer nanocomposites", JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2014), vol. 301, doi:doi:10.1016/j.apsusc.2014.02.112, pages 492 - 499, XP028837290 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2014.02.112 | - "Synthesis of highly hydrophobic floating magnetic polymer nanocomposites for the removal of oils from water surface", CHEN ET AL., journal Applied Surface Science, ELSEVIER B.V., (2013), vol. 286, pages 249 - 256 | - "Novel Coconut Oil Based Magnetite Nanofluid as an Ecofriendly Oil Spill Remover", RASHINA ET AL., journal Industrial & Engineering Chemistry Research, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2014), vol. 53, pages 15725 - 15730 | - BAO ET AL., "Facile preparation of superhydrophobic surfaces based on metal oxide nanoparticles", JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2014), vol. 303, doi:doi:10.1016/j.apsusc.2014.03.029, pages 473 - 480, XP028844208 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2014.03.029 | - FAN ET AL., "Study on fabrication of superhydrophobic and superparamagnetic functional coatings and its properties", JOURNAL SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 213, pages 8 - 14 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Superhydrophobicity of superparamagnetic nanocomposite modified with polystyrene", JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 258, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.apsusc.2012.01.113, pages 5080 - 5085, XP028464705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2012.01.113 | - "Magnet-induced temporary superhydrophobic coatings from one-pot synthesized hydrophobic magnetic nanoparticles", FANG ET AL., journal ACS Applied Materials & Interfaces, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 2, pages 1449 - 55 | - "Fluorine based superhydrophobic coatings", BRASSARD ET AL., journal Applied Sciences, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY PRESERVATION INTERNATIONAL, (2012), vol. 2, pages 453 - 464 | - "Transparent, superhydrophobic surfaces from one-step spin coating of hydrophobic nanoparticles", XU ET AL., journal ACS Applied Materials & Interfaces, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2012), vol. 4, pages 1118 - 25 | - SUN ET AL., "Superhydrophobicity of silica nanoparticles modified with polystyrene", JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 257, no. 6, pages 2308 - 2312, XP027562519 | - CHO ET AL., "Removal of oil by gelation using hydrophobic silica nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, (2014), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 1231 - 1235 | - YANG ET AL., "Facile preparation of super-hydrophobic and superoleophilic silica film on stainless steel mesh via sol-gel process", JOURNAL APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 256, no. 13, pages 4095 - 4102 | - PAZOKIFARD ET AL., "Processing of Ti02 nanoparticles with fluoroalkylsilanes in various pH-values: characterization and mechanism", JOURNAL ADVANCED POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 428 - 436 |