EP3342734 - CHAIN CONVEYOR FOR CONVEYING A PLURALITY OF ARTICLES AND METHOD FOR DETECTING THE WEAR CONDITION OF THE CHAIN CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel S.p.A. Via la Spezia 241/A cap. 43126 Parma / IT | [2023/09] |
Former [2021/45] | For all designated states Sidel End of Line & Tunnels Solutions Srl Via la Spezia 241/A cap. 43126 Parma / IT | ||
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Gebo Packaging Solutions Italy SRL Via la Spezia 241/A cap. 43126 Parma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERZAGHI, Claudio Gebo Packaging Solutions Italy SRL C/O Gebo Packaging Solutions Italy SRL 9 Via dell'Elettronica 37139 VERONA / IT | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Sidel Group c/o Gebo Packaging Solutions France 5-7 Rue du Commerce ZI - CS 73445 Reichstett 67455 Mundolsheim Cedex / FR | [2023/07] |
Former [2018/27] | Eltzer, Thomas Gebo Packaging Solutions France IP Central 5-7 rue du Commerce ZI - CS 73445 REICHSTETT 67455 Mundolsheim Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16207385.2 | 29.12.2016 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3342734 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3342734 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3342734 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65G43/02, B08B9/42 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
B65G43/02 (EP);
B08B9/30 (EP);
B08B9/423 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KETTENFÖRDERER ZUM FÖRDERN MEHRERER ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DES VERSCHLEISSZUSTANDS DES KETTENFÖRDERERS | [2018/27] | English: | CHAIN CONVEYOR FOR CONVEYING A PLURALITY OF ARTICLES AND METHOD FOR DETECTING THE WEAR CONDITION OF THE CHAIN CONVEYOR | [2018/27] | French: | CONVOYEUR À CHAÎNE SERVANT À TRANSPORTER UNE PLURALITÉ D'ARTICLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE L'ÉTAT D'USURE DU CONVOYEUR À CHAÎNE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 04.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | ES | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SE | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2444925 (FISCHER WALDO F) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 26 - line 50; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2984334 (DUNGFELDER CHRIS C, et al) [A] 10 * column 3, line 15 - line 21; figure 2 *; | [Y]JPH10300426 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2008024685 (FROST LINKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2012186613 (SIEGMUND MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0021]; figure -; claims 1,13 *; | [A]EP2727660 (SIDEL SPA CON SOCIO UNICO [IT]) [A] 10* paragraph [0037]; figure - * | by applicant | EP2727760 |