EP3217650 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING MEDIA GUIDANCE APPLICATION FUNCTIONALITY USING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/37] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAM, Terry Flat 3104, Hong Nin House, Hong Yat Court Lam Tin, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
SO, Jerry Room 2717, Ming Wik House, Kin Ming Estate Tseung Kwan O, NT, Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
WONG, Dick Room 3002, Mei Tin House, Hing Tin Estate Lam Tin, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
WONG, Ka Chun Flat F, 18/F Blk 5, Serenity Park Tai Po, NT, Hong Kong / CN | 05 /
CHUNG, David 4301 Watson Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 06 /
TSUI, Jason Flat B, 12/F, Block 8, Oscar By The Sea Tseung Kwan O, NT, Hong Kong / CN | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 60 Ludgate Hill London EC4M 7AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16207573.3 | 04.01.2011 | [2017/37] | Priority number, date | US20100652571 | 05.01.2010 Original published format: US 652571 | US20100652572 | 05.01.2010 Original published format: US 652572 | US20100652569 | 05.01.2010 Original published format: US 652569 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3217650 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N5/00, H04N7/24, H04L12/18, H04W4/02, H04W48/00 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP,KR);
H04N21/41265 (EP,KR,US);
H04L51/214 (EP);
H04N21/4126 (BR);
H04N21/43615 (EP,KR);
H04N21/43637 (EP,BR,KR);
H04N21/4856 (EP,BR);
H04N21/4884 (EP,BR);
H04N21/8106 (EP,BR);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04W4/02 (KR);
H04W48/00 (KR);
H04W8/24 (EP,KR);
H04L51/58 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER MEDIENANLEITUNGSANWENDUNGSFUNKTIONALITÄT MIT EINER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/37] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING MEDIA GUIDANCE APPLICATION FUNCTIONALITY USING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | [2017/37] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PROCURER UNE FONCTION D'APPLICATION DE GUIDAGE MULTIMÉDIA EN UTILISANT UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2017/37] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 30.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 21.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11700580.1 / EP2522127 | Divisional application(s) | EP17211185.8 / EP3367670 | EP17211186.6 / EP3367671 | EP17211187.4 / EP3367672 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007157240 (WALKER TODD A [US]); | [I]US2008288979 (SMOYER CLINTON J [US], et al); | [I]WO2009154267 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [E]EP2299711 (SHARP KK [JP]) |