EP3203274 - OPHTHALMIC LENS COMPRISING A THIN ANTIREFLECTIVE COATING WITH A VERY LOW REFLECTION IN THE VISIBLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURY, Hélène P.O. Box 94227 C/O ESSILOR (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 Rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | 02 /
CONTE, Dominique P.O. Box 94227 C/O ESSILOR (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 Rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | 03 /
DING, Xingzhao P.O. Box 94227 C/O ESSILOR (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 Rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 16305127.9 | 04.02.2016 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203274 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3203274 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/115, G02B1/116, G02B1/16, G02C7/02 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G02B1/116 (EP,CN,US);
G02B1/115 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (CN,US);
G02B1/16 (EP,US);
G02B5/008 (EP);
G02C7/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2017/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE LINSE MIT EINER DÜNNEN ANTIREFLEXBESCHICHTUNG MIT SEHR GERINGER REFLEXION IM SICHTBAREN | [2017/32] | English: | OPHTHALMIC LENS COMPRISING A THIN ANTIREFLECTIVE COATING WITH A VERY LOW REFLECTION IN THE VISIBLE | [2017/32] | French: | LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE COMPRENANT UN MINCE REVÊTEMENT ANTIREFLET AVEC UNE TRÈS FAIBLE RÉFLEXION DANS CE QUI EST VISIBLE | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007166522 (BEINAT OLIVIER [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0011] , [0030] , [0031] *; | [I]US2012048364 (AUVRAY STEPHANE [FR], et al) [I] 1-3,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0051] - [0053] - [0148] - [0158] * | Examination | WO9304993 | US6210784 | by applicant | EP0614957 | EP0867733 | JP2004334012 | - OWENS D. K. ET AL., "Estimation of the surface force energy of polymers", J. APPL. POLYM. SCI., (1969), vol. 13, pages 1741 - 1747 |