EP3232576 - FEED-FORWARD STAIRCASE CODES FOR CHANNEL CODING IN OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmalen, Laurent Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstr. 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Zhang, Lei Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16305442.2 | 15.04.2016 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232576 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29, H03M13/27, // H03M13/15, H03M13/19 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
H03M13/2906 (EP);
H03M13/2757 (EP);
H03M13/611 (EP);
H03M13/6368 (EP);
H03M13/1515 (EP);
H03M13/152 (EP);
H03M13/19 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORWÄRTSGERICHTETE STAIRCASE CODES ZUR KANALCODIERUNG IN OPTISCHEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2017/42] | English: | FEED-FORWARD STAIRCASE CODES FOR CHANNEL CODING IN OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2017/42] | French: | CODE STAIRCASE À FEED-FORWARD POUR CODAGE CANAL DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012266051 (FARHOODFAR ARASH [CA], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A] - BENJAMIN P SMITH ET AL, "Staircase Codes: FEC for 100 Gb/s OTN", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20120101), vol. 30, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JLT.2011.2175479, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 110 - 117, XP011397841 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2011.2175479 | [A] - SCHMALEN LAURENT ET AL, "Spatially Coupled Soft-Decision Error Correction for Future Lightwave Systems", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 33, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JLT.2014.2379957, ISSN 0733-8724, (20150301), pages 1109 - 1116, (20150309), XP011575185 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2014.2379957 | [A] - ITU, "SERIES G: TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS AND MEDIA, DIGITAL SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS Digital sections and digital line system - Optical fibre submarine cable systems Forward error correction for high bit-rate DWDM submarine systems ITU-T Recommendation G.975.1", ITU-T STANDARD IN FORCE (I), INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA, CH, (20040201), no. g9751 2/4, pages 1 - 58, XP002474600 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |