EP3316578 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING A PICTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOREAU, Dominique c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
ALAIN, Martin c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
ZEPEDA SALVATIERRA, Joaquin c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 04 /
TURKAN, Mehmet c/o Technicolor R&D France 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 16306398.5 | 25.10.2016 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316578 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/50, H04N19/147, H04N19/186, H04N19/593 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG EINES BILDES | [2018/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING A PICTURE | [2018/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE D'UNE IMAGE | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2739058 (CANON KK [JP]); | [XI]EP2903275 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]WO2016115981 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al); |