EP3211154 - MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF CONCRETE TOWERS FOR WIND TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/35] | MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF CONCRETE TOWERS FOR WIND TURBINES AND CONCRETE TOWER FOR WIND TURBINES | ||
[2021/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordex Energy Spain, S.A. Poligono industrial Barasoain Parcela 2 31395 Barasoain Navarra / ES | [2022/08] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Nordex Energy Spain, S.A. Poligono industrial Barasoain Parcela 2 31395 Barasoain Navarra / ES | ||
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Acciona Windpower S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovacion, 5 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRILLO ALONSO, Luis ACCIONA INGENIERÍA, S.A. C/ Anabel Segura 11, Edificio D, Planta 1 28108 Alcobendas, MADRID / ES | 02 /
BIEDMA GARCÍA, Manuel ACCIONA INGENIERÍA, S.A. C/ Anabel Segura 11, Edificio D, Planta 1 28108 Alcobendas, MADRID / ES | 03 /
GARCIA MAESTRE, Iván ACCIONA WINDPOWER S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación, 5 31621 Sarriguren (NAVARRA) / ES | 04 /
ARLABÁN GABEIRAS, Teresa ACCIONA WINDPOWER, S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación, 5 31621 Sarriguren (NAVARRA) / ES | 05 /
ARISTEGUI LANTERO, Jose Luis ACCIONA WINDPOWER, S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación, 5 31621 Sarriguren (NAVARRA) / ES | 06 /
GARCÍA SAYÉS, José Miguel ACCIONA WINDPOWER, S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación, 5 31621 Sarriguren (NAVARRA) / ES | 07 /
NÚÑEZ POLO, Miguel ACCIONA WINDPOWER, S.A. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación, 5 31621 Sarriguren (NAVARRA) / ES | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/08] |
Former [2017/35] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16382082.2 | 26.02.2016 | [2017/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3211154 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3211154 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/28, E04H12/34, E04G11/20, E04H12/12, F03D1/00, E04H12/00 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
B66C23/207 (EP);
E04H12/342 (US);
E04H12/12 (EP,US);
E04H12/16 (US);
E04H12/341 (EP,US);
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
E04G11/20 (EP,US);
E04G11/28 (EP,US);
E04H2012/006 (EP,US);
F05B2230/61 (EP,US);
F05B2240/912 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSPROCESS FÜR WINDRADMASTEN AUS BETON | [2021/13] | English: | MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF CONCRETE TOWERS FOR WIND TURBINES | [2021/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION POUR UN MAT DE EOLIENNE EN BETON | [2021/14] |
Former [2017/35] | HERSTELLUNGSPROCESS FÜR WINDRADMASTEN AUS BETON UND DER WINDRADMAST AUS BETON | ||
Former [2017/35] | MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF CONCRETE TOWERS FOR WIND TURBINES AND CONCRETE TOWER FOR WIND TURBINES | ||
Former [2017/35] | PROCÉDÉ POUR UN MAT DE ÉOLIENNE EN BÉTON ET MAT DE ÉOLIENNE EN BÉTON | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2016 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | IT | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | TR | 23.02.2022 | IE | 26.02.2022 | LU | 26.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | FR | 23.04.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | GB | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GB | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GB | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GB | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GB | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GB | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 23.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1227204 (RUND STAHL BAU GMBH & CO [AT]) [X] 1-6,12-15,18,19,21,22,24-30 * paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figures 1-5 * [I] 7-11,16,17,20,32,33; | [XI]DE102011053017 (MAX BOEGL WIND AG [DE]) [X] 19,21,23-29,31 * paragraph [0031]; figure 1 *[I] 32,33 |