EP3273239 - PROCEDURE OF ANALYSIS OF GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANS, HEPARINS AND THEIR DERIVATIVES BY NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios Farmacéuticos Rovi, S.A. Calle Julián Camarillo 35 28037 Madrid / ES | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Laboratorios Farmacéuticos Rovi, S.A. C/ Julián Camarillo 35 28037 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franco Rodriguez, Guillermo Laboratorios Farmacéuticos Rovi, S.A. Calle Julián Camarillo 35 28037 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Gutierro Aduriz, Ibon Laboratorios Farmacéuticos Rovi, S.A. Calle Julián Camarillo 35 28037 Madrid / ES | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/04] | 01 /
Franco, Guillermo Laboratorios Farmacéuticos Rovi, S.A. Calle Julián Camarillo 35 28037 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
Gutierro, Ibon Laboratorios Farmacéuticos Rovi, S.A. Calle Julián Camarillo 35 28037 Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Elzaburu S.L.P. C/ Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16382350.3 | 19.07.2016 | [2018/04] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273239 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, A61K31/727, G01N24/08 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G01N24/08 (EP,EA,US);
G01N24/087 (EA,US);
G01N33/50 (EP,EA,US);
G01R33/4625 (EP,EA,US);
G01R33/4633 (EP,EA,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON GLYKOSAMINOGLYKANEN, HEPARINEN UND DEREN DERIVATEN MITTELS KERNMAGNETISCHER RESONANZ | [2018/04] | English: | PROCEDURE OF ANALYSIS OF GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANS, HEPARINS AND THEIR DERIVATIVES BY NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE | [2018/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE GLYCOSAMINOGLYCANES, HÉPARINES ET LEURS DÉRIVÉS PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE NUCLÉAIRE | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2020 | 10.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2021 | 19.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/40] | 31.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7968082 (SHRIVER ZACHARY [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract; table 4; claims 1, 21; examples 1, 2 *; | [I] - S.-N. M. C. G. OLIVEIRA ET AL, "Structural and functional analyses of biosimilar enoxaparins available in Brazil", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, DE, (20140925), vol. 113, no. 1, doi:10.1160/TH14-05-0411, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 53 - 65, XP055312810 [I] 1-11 * abstract; figs. 1, 2; p. 57 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1160/TH14-05-0411 | [I] - MOURIER PIERRE A J ET AL, "Analytical and statistical comparability of generic enoxaparins from the US market with the originator product", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (20150729), vol. 115, doi:10.1016/J.JPBA.2015.07.038, ISSN 0731-7085, pages 431 - 442, XP029272868 [I] 1-11 * abstract; supplementary data b; figs. 11S-19S * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2015.07.038 | [A] - MICHAEL WEBER ET AL, "Using high-performance quantitative NMR (HP-qNMR ) for certifying traceable and highly accurate purity values of organic reference materials with uncertainties <0.1 %", ACCREDITATION AND QUALITY ASSURANCE, Berlin/Heidelberg, (20130118), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s00769-012-0944-9, ISSN 0949-1775, pages 91 - 98, XP055312811 [A] 1-11 * fig. 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00769-012-0944-9 | by applicant | - GANDHI NS; MANCERA RL., "The Structure of Glycosaminoglycans and their Interactions with Proteins", CHEM BIOL DRUG DES, (2008), vol. 72, pages 455 - 482 | - LINHARDT RJ; RICE KG; KIM YS ET AL., "Mapping and quantification of the major oligosaccharides component of heparin", BIOCHEM J, (1988), vol. 254, pages 781 - 787 | - TRAN HAM; GINSBERG JS., Basic principles and clinical practice, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, (2006), pages 1673 - 1688 | - XU Y. ET AL., "Chemoenzymatic synthesis of homogenous ultra low molecular weight heparins", SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 334, pages 498 - 501 | - BENI S. ET AL., ANAL BIOANAL CHEM, (2011), vol. 399, pages 527 - 539 | - CASU B. ET AL., "Characterization of Sulfation Patterns of Beef and Pig Mucosal Heparins by Nuclear Magnetic Resonance", ARZNEIM.-FORSCH./DRUG RES., (1996), vol. 46, pages 472 - 477, XP008178399 | - KEIRE D.A. ET AL., "Characterization of currently marketed heparin products: composition analysis by 2D-NMR", ANAL. METHODS, (2013), vol. 5, pages 2984 - 2994 | - OZUG J. ET AL., ANAL. BIOANAL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 403, pages 2733 - 2744 | - BISIO A. ET AL., "Structural features of low molecular weight heparins affecting their affinity to antithrombin", THROMB. HEMOST., (2009), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1160/TH09-02-0081, pages 865 - 873, XP002569660 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1160/TH09-02-0081 | - GUERRINI M. ET AL., "Low-molecular-weight heparins: structural differentiation by two-dimensional nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy", SEMIN THROMB HEMOST, (2007), vol. 33, pages 478 - 487 | - MALZ F.; JANCKE H., "Validation of quantitative NMR", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (2005), vol. 38, pages 813 - 823 | - GLAUSER B.F.; VAIRO B.C.; OLIVEIRA C.P.M.; CINELLI L.P.; PEREIRA M.S.; MOURAO P.A.S., "Generic versions of enoxaparin available for clinical use in Brazil are similar to the original drug", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2011), vol. 9, pages 1419 - 1422 | - DESAI U.R.; LINHARDT R.J., "Molecular Weight of Heparin using 13C Nuclear Magnetic Resonance Spectroscopy", J PHARM SCI, (1995), vol. 84, no. 2, pages 212 - 215 |