EP3320972 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE HAVING A SELF-CLEANING CATALYTICALLY ACTIVE SURFACE AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | For all designated states BSH Electrodomésticos España, S.A. Avenida de la Industria 49 50016 Zaragoza / ES | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Artal Lahoz, Maria Carmen Tejar Nº21, Esc-2ª, 5º-A 50007 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
Bischof, Andreas Käthe Niederkirchner Strasse 28 10407 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Bunuel Magdalena, Miguel Angel Julian Sanz Ibañez,42-8ºF 50017 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
Lazaro Villarroya, Guillermo Alberto Cortes de Aragon 50, 2D 50005 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
Sanz Naval, Javier Avenida Penaflor n° 108, bajo Penaflor 50193 Zaragoza / ES | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16382519.3 | 09.11.2016 | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3320972 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/043, C02F1/72, A61L2/232, B01J27/057, B01J21/18, B01J37/03, B01J21/06, // C02F1/78, C02F1/74, B01J27/20, C02F1/50, B01J37/02, C02F103/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C02F1/725 (EP);
A61L2/232 (EP);
B01J21/063 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP);
B01J27/043 (EP);
B01J27/0573 (EP);
B01J27/20 (EP);
B01J37/0215 (EP);
B01J37/0219 (EP);
B01J37/036 (EP);
C02F1/74 (EP);
B01J2523/00 (EP);
C02F1/505 (EP);
C02F1/722 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F2103/002 (EP);
C02F2303/04 (EP);
C02F2303/20 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/18, B01J2523/33, B01J2523/62, B01J2523/847 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2018/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT EINER SELBSTREINIGENDEN, KATALYTISCH AKTIVEN OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DESSELBEN | [2018/20] | English: | HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE HAVING A SELF-CLEANING CATALYTICALLY ACTIVE SURFACE AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME | [2018/20] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER AVEC SURFACE AUTONETTOYANTE PAR CATALYSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CELUI-CI | [2018/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 16.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/43] | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN204445765U ; | [Y]CN105837939 ; | [Y]CN1322590 ; | [Y]CN104587512 ; | [Y]EP0348288 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * column 3, line 24 - line 51; example 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]JPH04121571 (HAITETSUKU JAPAN KK) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2001220305 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1,3,5-15 * abstract *; | [XI]US2004180220 (GUENEAU LETHICIA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0047] , [0073] , [0074]; example 6 * [I] 6-13; | [Y]KR20040093958 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1,3,5-15 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004110620 (CPC CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,4-15* claim 1 *; | [Y]US2010209730 (THOMSEN SCOTT V [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0015] , [0030]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102009032476 (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1,4-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0008] , [0026] , [0027] *; | [Y]JP2015066059 (TOSHIBA LIFESTYLE PRODUCTS & SERVICES CORP, et al) [Y] 1,3,5-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] - [0011] - [0015] , [0016] , [0027]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 65, Database accession no. 2015-53784K, XP002770121 & CN204445765U U 20150708 (HUANG R) [Y] 1,3,5-15 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 83, Database accession no. 2016-520768, XP002770122 & CN105837939 A 20160810 (NINGBO HI-TECH ZONE XIAYUAN TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1,3,5-15 * abstract * | [Y] - HEE YEON KI ET AL, "A study on multifunctional wool textiles treated with nano-sized silver", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20070628), vol. 42, no. 19, doi:10.1007/S10853-007-1572-3, ISSN 1573-4803, pages 8020 - 8024, XP019528766 [Y] 1,3,5-15 * page 8021, column left * * page 8022, column r, paragraph 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-007-1572-3 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 19, Database accession no. 2002-140768, XP002779577 & CN1322590 A 20011121 (UNIV TONGJI) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 55, Database accession no. 2015-41620M, XP002779578 & CN104587512 A 20150506 (UNIV SHANGHAI SECOND POLYTECHNIC) [Y] 1,4-15 * abstract * | [Y] - LEI ZHU ET AL, "Rapid sonochemical synthesis of novel PbSe-graphene-TiO2 composite sonocatalysts with enhanced on decolorization performance and generation of ROS", ULTRASONICS: SONOCHEMISTRY., GB, (20150527), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/j.ultsonch.2015.05.037, ISSN 1350-4177, pages 252 - 261, XP055462569 [Y] 1,4-15 * page 253, column r, paragraph 2.3 * * page 260, column r, paragraph 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultsonch.2015.05.037 | by applicant | EP1141210 | DE102009026712 | EP2765136 | WO2014122225 | US2014231363 | WO2014154432 | DE102013205302 | WO2015078737 | EP2761073 |