EP3061332 - PORTAL WHEEL DRIVE UNIT FOR A HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE AGRICULTURAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehlen, Volker Stüvestr. 13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | 02 /
Voth, Robert Am Sonnenhügel 6 49163 Bohmte / DE | 03 /
Hausmann, Carsten Kluckhöfer Weg 25 32657 Lemgo / DE | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 16401012.6 | 19.02.2016 | [2016/35] | Priority number, date | DE201510102824 | 27.02.2015 Original published format: DE102015102824 | [2016/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3061332 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01B51/02, B60K17/04, B62D49/06 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
A01B51/023 (EP);
B60B35/001 (EP);
B60B35/125 (EP);
B60K17/046 (EP);
B62D49/0607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORTALRADANTRIEBSEINHEIT FÜR EIN HÖHENVERSTELLBARES LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES FAHRZEUG | [2016/35] | English: | PORTAL WHEEL DRIVE UNIT FOR A HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE AGRICULTURAL VEHICLE | [2016/35] | French: | UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT A PORTIQUE POUR UN VEHICULE AGRICOLE REGLABLE EN HAUTEUR | [2016/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2058154 (HERBERT DAMMANN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0026] - [0031]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3922216 (VYZK USTAV STAVEBNICH ZEMNICH [CS]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 50 *; | [A]WO2012092003 (AGCO CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0019] - [0038]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2011148053 (MOTEBENNUR VIJAY [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0038]; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | EP2058154 |