EP3205768 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR SEPARATING A SOLIDS/FLUID MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [2021/42] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Biochemtex S.p.A. Strada Ribrocca 11 15057 Tortona (AL) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARCHI, Paolo Via Romita, 51/9 15069 Serravalle Scrivia (AL) / IT | 02 /
GIUNGATO, Ezio Via Caduti della Libertà, 7 15057 Tortona (AL) / IT | 03 /
BOVERI, Giuseppina Via Emilia, 9 15057 Tortona (AL) / IT | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/42] |
Former [2017/33] | Zambardino, Umberto Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16425009.4 | 12.02.2016 | [2017/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205768 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3205768 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D21B1/36, B04C3/06, B04C5/04 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
D21B1/36 (EP,US);
B04C5/04 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | D21B1/36, B04C3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN VON FESTSTOFFEN/FLUIDGEMISCH | [2017/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR SEPARATING A SOLIDS/FLUID MIXTURE | [2017/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉPARER UN MÉLANGE SOLIDE/FLUIDE | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 06.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | RS | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | NO | 20.01.2022 | LU | 12.02.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
LU | 12.02.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
LU | 12.02.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
LU | 12.02.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
LU | 12.02.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | EE | 20.10.2021 | |
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
LU | 12.02.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | EE | 20.10.2021 | |
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 20.10.2021 | |
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LV | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | LV | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | LV | 20.10.2021 | |
RS | 20.10.2021 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 20.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010001097 (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 8, paragraph last - page 10, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]US2014110509 (RAWLS JOSEPH MONROE [US], et al) [A] 1,10* paragraph [0031]; figure - * | by applicant | WO2015028156 | - "Chemical Pulping Part 1, Fiber Chemistry and Technology", FARDIM, PEDRO, Papermaking Science and Technology, (2011), pages 288 - 289 | - "Mechanical Puiping", LONNBERG, BRUNO, Papermaking Science and Technology, (2009), page 200 | - "Chemical Pulping Part 1, Fiber Chemistry and Technology", FARDIM, PEDRO, Papermaking Science and Technology, (2011), page 289 |