EP3205729 - METHOD FOR DETECTING FETAL NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feichtinger, Wilfried Berggasse 4 2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feichtinger, Wilfried Berggasse 4 A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | 02 /
Feichtinger, Elisabeth Berggasse 4 A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | 03 /
Palini, Simone Cervesi Hospital Ausl Romagna Beethoven 2 I-47841 Cattolica RN / IT | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Keschmann, Marc Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1010 Wien / AT | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 16450002.7 | 11.02.2016 | [2017/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205729 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP);
C12Q1/6881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS FETALER NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2017/33] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING FETAL NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2017/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA VÉRIFICATION D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE FÉTAL | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014242581 (JOHNSON MARK T [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * the whole document * * Abs. 5, 21, 56, 95-114 * [I] 7; | [YD]WO2013116889 (IVF ZENTREN PROF ZECH BREGENZ GMBH [AT]) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2015114574 (PÉCSI TUDOMÁNYEGYETEM [HU], et al) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2013116889 | WO2015114574 |