EP3247603 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE WITH COMPRESSED AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALOGH, Levente 16. IV/11 St Reviczky 6000 Kecskemet / HU | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 16701153.5 | 21.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016EP51202 | Priority number, date | DE20151000893 | 23.01.2015 Original published format: DE102015000893 | [2017/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016116546 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247603 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00, B01D53/26, B60T13/68, F15B21/04 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP,CN);
B60T13/66 (EP,CN);
B60T13/683 (EP,CN);
B60T13/686 (EP,CN);
B60T17/008 (EP,CN);
B60T17/02 (EP,CN);
B60T17/22 (EP,CN);
F15B11/064 (EP);
F15B21/041 (EP);
F15B21/048 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2258/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSORGEN EINES NUTZFAHRZEUGS MIT DRUCKLUFT | [2017/48] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE WITH COMPRESSED AIR | [2017/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION D'UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE EN AIR COMPRIMÉ | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 23.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 19.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0978397 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1 * Ventile 12 und 14 *; | [XY]EP1216860 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1 * Ventile 16 und 18 * [Y] 9; | [XYI]WO2012079698 (WABCO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10 * Seite 1, Zeile 1-5, Seite 26, Z. 10, Ventilanordnung 74, Seite 27, 2. Absatz, Z. 5-7 davon, Eingang 0 in Figur 1, Ausgang 3 in Figur 1, Element 61 in Figur 1, Speicher 92 in Figur 1, Ventile 73 und 74, Verbindung 52, Drossel 72, 70, Knoten 53, 77, über Ventil 63 in Figur 1.;; claims 18,19 * [Y] 9 [I] 4-7,11,12; | [A]WO2012079690 (WABCO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]DE102011121755 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10 * insbesondere Ventile 10 und 14 *; | [X]US2013195682 (BECHER HANS-OTTO [DE], et al) [X] 1,10 * Ventile 71 und 81 * |