EP3245522 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PARAMETER OF A FLOW OF A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl von Ossietzky Universität Oldenburg Ammerländer Heerstrasse 114-118 26129 Oldenburg / DE | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEINKE, Joachim Wabenweg 18 26125 Oldenburg / DE | 02 /
HÖLLING, Michael Sommerweg 38A 26129 Oldenburg / DE | 03 /
BARTH, Stephan Nadorsterstrasse 133 26123 Oldenburg / DE | 04 /
PUCZYLOWSKI, Jaroslaw Haarenufer 16 26122 Oldenburg / DE | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Tappe, Udo, et al Zacco Patent- und Rechtsanwalts GmbH Am Wall 187-189 28195 Bremen / DE | [2019/46] |
Former [2017/47] | Tappe, Udo zacco Dr. Peters & Partner Am Wall 187-189 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16701730.0 | 12.01.2016 | [2017/47] | WO2016EP50457 | Priority number, date | DE20151000064 | 12.01.2015 Original published format: DE102015000064 | [2017/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016113247 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3245522 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3245522 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/02, G01F1/28, G01L7/02, G01P13/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G01P5/02 (EP,CN,US);
G01P5/04 (US);
G01F1/28 (EP,CN,US);
G01F1/8463 (US);
G01P13/0026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/47] | G01P5/02, G01F1/28, G01L7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN MINDESTENS EINES PARAMETERS EINER STRÖMUNG EINES FLUIDS | [2017/47] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PARAMETER OF A FLOW OF A FLUID | [2017/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER AU MOINS UN PARAMÈTRE D'ÉCOULEMENT D'UN FLUIDE | [2017/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 05.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2016 | AL | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | IE | 12.01.2020 | LU | 12.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.01.2016 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3216247 (MILLER JACK V) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11,13 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 32 *; | [I]JP2006023240 (ATR ADVANCED TELECOMM RES INST) [I] 1-4,11-13 * abstract ** figure 13 *; | [XI]US2009241686 (BONNAT PIERRE [US]) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0073] * [I] 5,8; | [X] - BARTH STEPHAN ET AL, "Laser-cantilever anemometer: A new high-resolution sensor for air and liquid flows", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20050711), vol. 76, no. 7, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 75110 - 075110, XP012079592 [X] 1-13 * page 1 - page 3 * | by applicant | FR2764066 | - J. PUCZYLOWSKI; J. PEINKE; M. HÖLLING, "New anemometer for offshore use", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS: CONFERENCE SERIES, (2011), vol. 318, page 072015 |