EP3251399 - METHOD FOR TESTING A TEST RADIO COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE OF A GATEWAY IN A GATEWAY POOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagemcom Broadband SAS 250, route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAULIN, Jean-Philippe c/o Sagemcom Broadband SAS 250 Route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
DANGY-CAYE, Nicolas c/o Sagemcom Broadband SAS 250 Route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [2019/45] |
Former [2017/49] | Le Guen-Maillet 5, place de Newquay BP 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16701742.5 | 25.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016EP51423 | Priority number, date | FR20150050589 | 27.01.2015 Original published format: FR 1550589 | [2017/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016120194 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251399 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3251399 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/04, H04L12/64, H04L12/26, // H04W88/16 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
H04W24/04 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,CN,US);
H04L43/0817 (US);
H04W88/16 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | H04W24/04, H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINER FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG EINES GATEWAYS IN EINEM GATEWAY-POOL | [2017/49] | English: | METHOD FOR TESTING A TEST RADIO COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE OF A GATEWAY IN A GATEWAY POOL | [2017/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TEST D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION À TESTER D'UNE PASSERELLE D'UN PARC DE PASSERELLES | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 02.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2016 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | IE | 25.01.2020 | LU | 25.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.01.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005328230 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0219] * * paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0222] * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0225] * * paragraph [0255] - paragraph [0259] *; | [A]US2007050240 (BELANI ESHWAR [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0248] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0136] *; | [XYI]WO2008127631 (HART COMM FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1,13,15-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0160] * [Y] 4-12,14 [I] 2,3; | [XYI]US2009316628 (ENNS FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1,13,15-17 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120] * [Y] 4-12,14 [I] 2,3; | [A]US2010182915 (MONTEMURRO MICHAEL [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0082] ** paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0092] *; | [A]GB2482587 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 5, paragraph first - paragraph fourth * * page 23, paragraph first *; | [Y]WO2013142967 (DISTERNET TECHNOLOGY INC [CA]) [Y] 4-12,14 * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0200] * | by applicant | US8280442 |