EP3253961 - CONTROL VALVE FOR FUEL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi International Operations Luxembourg S.à r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENTERS, Richard, Denis, Jacques, Alain 10 rue des Blardières 41350 Vineuil / FR | 02 /
CHERON, Antonin 16 rue de Lamballe 45400 Fleury-les-Aubrais / FR | 03 /
SAUVETRE, Ludovic 18 rue de la Serfilière 41120 Cellettes / FR | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | BorgWarner France SAS Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Delphi France SAS c/o Delphi Technologies Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2017/50] | Delphi France SAS Patent Department 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16701958.7 | 29.01.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016EP51929 | Priority number, date | FR20150050782 | 02.02.2015 Original published format: FR 1550782 | [2017/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016124496 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253961 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253961 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M63/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP);
F02M63/0015 (EP);
F02M63/0033 (EP);
F02M63/0071 (EP);
F02M63/0078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVENTIL FÜR KRAFTSTOFFINJEKTOR | [2017/50] | English: | CONTROL VALVE FOR FUEL INJECTOR | [2017/50] | French: | VANNE DE COMMANDE POUR INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 20.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2016 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | IE | 29.01.2019 | LU | 29.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.01.2016 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.01.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.01.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.01.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.01.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.01.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
IE | 29.01.2019 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
LU | 29.01.2019 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1612398 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]EP1944500 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [AD]EP2620632 (DELPHI TECH HOLDING SARL [LU]) [AD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031]; figure 5 * | by applicant | EP2620632 |