EP3253705 - TRANSPORT SYSTEM WITH AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE AND A GRIPPING DEVICE FOR PICKING UP PIECE GOODS FROM ABOVE, AND METHOD FOR PICKING UP PIECE GOODS USING THIS TRANSPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/50] | GRIPPING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING PIECE GOODS FROM ABOVE | ||
[2019/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRYCZA, Philipp Hochstrasse 100 45731 Waltrop / DE | 02 /
FIEDLER, Martin Mittelstrasse 19 44139 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
ROTGERI, Mathias Am Rebstock 34 44263 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
DÖLTGEN, Martin Hellweg 248 44388 Dortmund / DE | [2018/08] |
Former [2017/50] | 01 /
WRYCZA, Philipp Hochstrasse 100 45731 Waltrop / DE | ||
02 /
FIEDLER, Martin Mittelstrasse 19 44139 Dortmund / DE | |||
03 /
ROTGERI, Mathias Am Rebstock 34 44263 Dortmund / DE | |||
04 /
DÖLTGEN, Martin Saarbrückerstrasse 22 44135 Dortmund / DE | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16702924.8 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016EP52312 | Priority number, date | DE201510202181 | 06.02.2015 Original published format: DE102015202181 | [2017/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016124658 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253705 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253705 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/66 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B66C1/66 (EP,US);
B64D1/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTSYSTEM MIT EINEM UNBEMANNTEN LUFTFAHRZEUG UND EINER GREIFVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME VON STÜCKGÜTERN VON OBEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON STÜCKGÜTERN UNTER VERWENDUNG DIESES TRANSPORTSYSTEMS | [2019/45] | English: | TRANSPORT SYSTEM WITH AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE AND A GRIPPING DEVICE FOR PICKING UP PIECE GOODS FROM ABOVE, AND METHOD FOR PICKING UP PIECE GOODS USING THIS TRANSPORT SYSTEM | [2019/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT AVEC UN VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE ET UN DISPOSITIF DE PRÉHENSION POUR PRÉLEVER DES CHARGES ISOLÉES, PAR LE DESSUS, ET MÉTHODE POUR PRÉLEVER DES CHARGES ISOLÉES, UTILISANT CE SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT | [2019/45] |
Former [2017/50] | GREIFVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON STÜCKGÜTER VON OBEN | ||
Former [2017/50] | GRIPPING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING PIECE GOODS FROM ABOVE | ||
Former [2017/50] | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉHENSION ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SAISIR DES ARTICLES DEPUIS LE HAUT | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 23.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | IT | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MK | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MK | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
IT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA925906 (LEMATTA W [US]) [Y] 3,10,11 * figure 1 *; | [XAY]FR2210563 (BERNARD MAURICE ET FILS [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,14 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 28 * * figure - * [A] 15 [Y] 6; | [A]US4121868 (PIERCE RAY E, et al) [A] 3* figures 2, 8 *; | [Y]US4547163 (LANGPAAP RUDOLF [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * figure - * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 33 *; | [X]SU1379233 (SP PK T B ELEKTROTERMICHESKOGO [SU]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * figure - *; | [XAY]GB2214158 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 16 * * page 7, line 19 - line 21 * * figures 2-8 * [A] 8 [Y] 3,10,11; | [X]US2007222244 (CORNWELL CARL R [US]) [X] 1,4,7-9,14,15 * figure - * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] * * examples 18-22 * | Examination | US2013299640 | by applicant | KR20140115711 |