EP3254294 - DVC UTILIZING MIMS IN THE ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qorvo US, Inc. 7628 Thorndike Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/26] | For all designated states Qorvo US, Inc. 7628 Thorndike Road Greensboro, NC 27409 / US | ||
Former [2017/50] | For all designated states Cavendish Kinetics, Inc. 2960 North First Street San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KAMPEN, Robertus Petrus Spanjaardwaard 25 5236 XR s-Hertogenbosch / NL | 02 /
GADDI, Roberto Dr. Ariensstraat 1 5213 VS s-Hertogenbosch / NL | 03 /
KNIPE, Richard L. 4101 Country Road 1006 McKinney, Texas 75071 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2017/50] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 16703698.7 | 28.01.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US15360 | Priority number, date | US201562112217P | 05.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562112217 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126517 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254294 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3254294 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01H59/00, H01H1/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
H01H59/0009 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01G4/005 (US);
H01H1/0036 (US);
B81B2201/016 (CN,KR,US);
H01H2001/0057 (US);
H01H2001/0084 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DVC MIT VERWENDUNG VON MIMS IM ANKER | [2017/50] | English: | DVC UTILIZING MIMS IN THE ANCHOR | [2017/50] | French: | DVC UTILISANT UNE MIMS DANS L'ANCRAGE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 08.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | LU | 28.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
IT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2005248423 (QIAN JIANGYUAN [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1-9 * [A] 12-18 [Y] 10,11 [I] 2-6,8,9; | [A]US2007278075 (TERANO AKIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US2010328840 (YAMAZAKI HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [A]US2011314669 (STAMPER ANTHONY K [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [YA]WO2013033613 (CAVENDISH KINETICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * [A] 1-9 | Examination | US2010116632 | US2010254068 |