EP3261901 - FOLDABLE CHILD SEAT AND STROLLER INCLUDING SUCH A CHILD SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/01] | COLLAPSIBLE CHILD SEAT AND PUSHCHAIR COMPRISING A CHILD SEAT OF THIS TYPE | ||
[2022/02] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYBEX GmbH Riedinger Strasse 18 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POS, Martin Parsifalstraße 35 95444 Bayreuth / DE | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Pfrang, Tilman Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16705939.3 | 22.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016EP53624 | Priority number, date | DE201510102538 | 23.02.2015 Original published format: DE102015102538 | [2018/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016135074 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261901 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261901 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/14, B62B9/10 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B62B7/142 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47D1/06 (US);
B62B7/006 (US);
B62B9/104 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62B9/12 (US);
B62B2202/42 (US);
B62B2205/22 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENKLAPPBARER KINDERSITZ SOWIE KINDERWAGEN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN KINDERSITZ | [2018/01] | English: | FOLDABLE CHILD SEAT AND STROLLER INCLUDING SUCH A CHILD SEAT | [2022/02] | French: | SIEGE D'ENFANT PLIABLE ET POUSSETTE COMPRENANT UN TEL SIEGE | [2022/02] |
Former [2018/01] | COLLAPSIBLE CHILD SEAT AND PUSHCHAIR COMPRISING A CHILD SEAT OF THIS TYPE | ||
Former [2018/01] | SIÈGE ENFANT PLIABLE ET POUSSETTE COMPORTANT UN TEL SIÈGE ENFANT | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 11.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22184386.5 / EP4098514 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2023
17.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2023
17.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2023/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2023
Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 29.06.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.11.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | AT | 22.02.2023 | IE | 22.02.2023 | LU | 22.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 13.07.2022 | |
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0479132 (COMBI CO [JP]) [A] 1-14* column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 49; figure - *; | [X]WO2010050804 (ROYALTY BUGABOO GMBH [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,6,14 * page 9, line 20 - page 12, line 32; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP2275321 (LERADO ZHONG SHAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,3,6,14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2-11 *; | [A]WO2014207689 (PEG PEREGO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * page 17, line 15 - page 19, line 31; figure - * | Opposition | EP0479132 | WO2009077787 | WO2010040644 | WO2010050804 | WO2010110831 | EP2275321 | US2011012324 | US2011241395 | CN202574327U | WO2013070787 | WO2014042533 | WO2014044737 | CN203544082U | US8764048 | CN203805969U | AU2014218398 | WO2014207689 | US2015008659 | EP2832625 | GB2516906 | EP2937262 |