EP3261692 - ACCESSORY DEVICE WITH MOUNTING SAFETY FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Jens Christian Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16706216.5 | 25.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016EP53964 | Priority number, date | EP20150156963 | 27.02.2015 Original published format: EP 15156963 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016135236 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261692 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261692 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/20 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/2455 (US);
A61M5/31553 (EP,CN,US);
G16H20/10 (US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/60 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/6072 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/2466 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | A61M5/24, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUBEHÖRVORRICHTUNG MIT SICHERHEITSFUNKTION | [2020/14] | English: | ACCESSORY DEVICE WITH MOUNTING SAFETY FEATURE | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE À CARACTÉRISTIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2020/14] |
Former [2018/01] | ZUBEHÖRVORRICHTUNG MIT MONTAGESICHERHEITSFUNKTION | ||
Former [2018/01] | DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ DE MONTAGE | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 03.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2016 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | ES | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | IT | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | NL | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | IE | 25.02.2021 | LU | 25.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.02.2016 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.02.2016 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
IT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
ES | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
NL | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9902210 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 3, 6 * * page 9, lines 24-28 *; | [AD]WO2010037828 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-11 * figure 8 * * page 19, lines 7-10, 16-19 *; | [IY]WO2010098928 (LIFESCAN INC [US], et al) [I] 1,4-7,9-11 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 68] , [0 70] , [0 71] * [Y] 1,4-7,9; | [XY]WO2013120776 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,9 * figures 4, 13 * * page 14, lines 4-6 * [Y] 1,4-7,9; | [AD]WO2014161952 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [AD] 1-11* figure 6 * |