EP3259587 - METHOD FOR INSPECTING A WELD SEAM WITH ULTRASONIC PHASED ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2024/15] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ININGER, Jörg Robert-Bosch-Str. 3 50354 Huerth / DE | 02 /
FALTER, Stephan Robert-Bosch-Str. 3 50354 Huerth / DE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group, et al Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2024/15] | Novagraaf Group, et al Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2017/52] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16707334.5 | 17.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016US18244 | Priority number, date | US201562117149P | 17.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562117149 P | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016134005 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259587 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259587 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/07 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N29/07 (EP);
G10K11/346 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2675 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | G01N29/26, G10K11/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION VON SCHWEISSNÄHTEN MIT ULTRASCHALL-GRUPPENSTRAHLERN | [2024/04] | English: | METHOD FOR INSPECTING A WELD SEAM WITH ULTRASONIC PHASED ARRAY | [2017/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION DE SOUDURES AVEC DES RESEAUX EN PHASE ULTRASONORE | [2024/04] |
Former [2017/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION EINER SCHWEISSNAHT MIT ULTRASCHALL-GRUPPENSTRAHLER | ||
Former [2017/52] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UN CORDON DE SOUDURE À L'AIDE D'UN RÉSEAU ULTRASONORE PILOTÉ EN PHASE | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1398627 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0041] * [I] 5,6,11,12; | [XI]EP1953544 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0119] * [I] 5,6,10-12; | [X]US2013199297 (IMBERT CHRISTOPHE [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] - [0166] *; | [X]US2014165730 (NA JEONG K [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0025] - [0026] * | Examination | WO0171338 | EP2574956 |