EP3265630 - SECURITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTF Europe Limited Leofric House Binley Road Coventry, West Midlands CV3 1JN / GB | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Tim John 39 Main Street Newbold-on-Avon Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1HH / GB | 02 /
CROSS, Liam Edward Michael Leofric House Binley Road Coventry West Midlands CV3 1JN / GB | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Croston, David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Unsworth, Jennifer Mary Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16707524.1 | 25.02.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016GB50472 | Priority number, date | GB20150003499 | 02.03.2015 Original published format: GB 201503499 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016139450 | Date: | 09.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3265630 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00, E05B35/00 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
E05B73/0082 (EP,GB,US);
A47F7/0246 (GB);
E05B35/008 (EP,US);
E05B73/0005 (GB);
F16M11/04 (GB);
F16M11/041 (EP);
F16M13/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/02] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE | [2018/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ | [2018/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 01.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/35] | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2018 | 28.02.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014160758 (INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8,9,19 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008009875 (ARTFORM INTERNAT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,19 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2014019072 (KOBOLD WILL [CA]) [X] 1-3,8-12,19 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2353914 (CITECH CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-3,5-7,19 * the whole document *; | [X]US6256387 (WANG CHIN-YANG [TW]) [X] 1,5-7,19 * the whole document *; | [X]TWM471529U (HUANG MING-HSIEN [TW]) [X] 1 * abstract * |