EP3259887 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC OPTIMAL ROUTE REFLECTOR ROOT ADDRESS ASSIGNEMT TO ROUTE REFLECTOR CLIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/52] | AUTOMATIC OPTIMAL ROUTE REFLECTOR ROOT ADDRESS ASSIGNMENT TO ROUTE REFLECTOR CLIENTS AND FAST FAILOVER IN A NETWORK ENVIRONMENT | ||
[2021/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2021/32] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. SJC/10/2/1 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Keyur 6297 Skywalker Dr. San Jose, California 95135 / US | 02 /
BAYRAKTAR, Serpil 18400 Overlook Rd. Unit 66 Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 03 /
BHARDWAJ, Manish 63 Paramount Terrace San Francisco, California 94118 / US | 04 /
WARD, David D. 32460 Loma Chiquita Rd. Los Gatos, California 95033 / US | 05 /
PITHAWALA, Burjiz 21900 Woodbury Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/32] |
Former [2017/52] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16708285.8 | 13.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016US17909 | Priority number, date | US201562119044P | 20.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119044 P | US201562119048P | 20.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119048 P | US201562119113P | 21.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119113 P | US201562119114P | 21.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119114 P | US201562119115P | 21.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119115 P | US201514809017 | 24.07.2015 Original published format: US201514809017 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016133831 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3259887 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259887 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/717, H04L12/753 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
H04L45/42 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/127 (CN,US);
H04L45/02 (US);
H04L45/03 (EP,CN);
H04L45/033 (EP,CN);
H04L45/04 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L45/48 (US);
H04L45/488 (EP,CN);
H04L45/74 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISCHE ZUWEISUNG DER OPTIMALEN ROUTENREFLEKTOR-ROOTADRESSE ZU ROUTENREFLEKTOR-CLIENTS | [2021/10] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATIC OPTIMAL ROUTE REFLECTOR ROOT ADDRESS ASSIGNEMT TO ROUTE REFLECTOR CLIENTS | [2021/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR L' AFFECTATION D'ADRESSE RACINE D'UN RÉFLECTEUR DE CHEMIN OPTIMAL AUTOMATIQUE POUR DES CLIENTS DE RÉFLECTEUR DE CHEMIN | [2021/10] |
Former [2017/52] | AUTOMATISCHE ZUWEISUNG DER OPTIMALEN ROUTENREFLEKTOR-ROOTADRESSE ZU ROUTENREFLEKTOR-CLIENTS UND SCHNELLE AUSFALLSICHERUNG IN EINER NETZWERKUMGEBUNG | ||
Former [2017/52] | AUTOMATIC OPTIMAL ROUTE REFLECTOR ROOT ADDRESS ASSIGNMENT TO ROUTE REFLECTOR CLIENTS AND FAST FAILOVER IN A NETWORK ENVIRONMENT | ||
Former [2017/52] | AFFECTATION D'ADRESSE RACINE D'UN RÉFLECTEUR DE CHEMIN OPTIMAL AUTOMATIQUE POUR DES CLIENTS DE RÉFLECTEUR DE CHEMIN ET UN BASCULEMENT RAPIDE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 03.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21183261.3 / EP3923525 | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2016 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | IE | 13.02.2022 | LU | 13.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007091794 (FILSFILS CLARENCE [BE], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008062861 (SHAND MIKE [GB], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [XA] - RASZUK MIRANTIS INC C CASSAR CISCO SYSTEMS E AMAN TELIASONERA B DECRAENE S LITKOWSKI ORANGE R, "BGP Optimal Route Reflection (BGP-ORR); draft-ietf-idr-bgp-optimal-route-reflection-08.txt", BGP OPTIMAL ROUTE REFLECTION (BGP-ORR); DRAFT-IETF-IDR-BGP-OPTIMAL-ROUTE-REFLECTION-08.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20141023), pages 1 - 22, XP015102391 [X] 16 * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 12 * [A] 1-15,17-19 | Examination | US2006140136 | by applicant | - BATES, T.; CHEN, E.; R. CHANDRA, "BGP Route Reflection: An Alternative to Full Mesh Internal BGP (IBGP", REQUESTS FOR COMMENT (RFC) 4456, (200604), URL: http://www.rfc-editor.org/info/rfc4457 |