EP3259697 - MINING SANDBOXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität des Saarlandes Campus Saarbrücken 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELLER, Andreas Blumenstrasse 45 66111 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
JAMROZIK, Konrad Am Geisenberg 6A 66125 Saarbrücken / DE | [2018/07] |
Former [2017/52] | 01 /
ZELLER, Andreas Eichendorffstrasse 13D 66133 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
02 /
JAMROZIK, Konrad Am Geisenberg 6A 66125 Saarbrücken / DE | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 16709293.1 | 16.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016EP53276 | Priority number, date | LU20150092657 | 16.02.2015 Original published format: LU 92657 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016131830 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259697 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259697 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/53, G06F21/55, G06F11/36 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
G06F21/53 (EP,US);
G06F11/3684 (EP,US);
G06F21/552 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | G06F21/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERGBAUSANDKÄSTEN | [2017/52] | English: | MINING SANDBOXES | [2017/52] | French: | BACS À SABLE POUR EXPLORATION | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 10.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2016 | AL | 22.05.2019 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | IT | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | NO | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | IE | 16.02.2020 | LU | 16.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 16.02.2016 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 16.02.2016 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
IT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NO | 22.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US7047369 (GRUPER SHIMON [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 61 *; | [A]US2007113270 (KRAEMER JEFFREY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] ** paragraphs [0027] - [0032] - [0036] - [0048] *; | [A]US2009313699 (JANG IN SOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0044] * * abstract *; | [A] - RIYADH MAHMOOD ET AL, "A whitebox approach for automated security testing of Android applications on the cloud", AUTOMATION OF SOFTWARE TEST (AST), 2012 7TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20120602), doi:10.1109/IWAST.2012.6228986, ISBN 978-1-4673-1821-1, pages 22 - 28, XP032451145 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWAST.2012.6228986 | by applicant | - "Short paper: A look at smartphone permission models", AU, K. W. Y.; ZHOU, Y. F.; HUANG, Z.; GILL, P.; LIE, D, Proceedings of the 1 st ACM Workshop on Security and Privacy in Smartphones and Mobile Devices (New York, NY, USA, 2011), SPSM '11, ACM, pages 63 - 68 | - "PScout: Analyzing the AndroidTM permission specification", AU, K. W. Y.; ZHOU, Y. F.; HUANG, Z.; LIE, D, Proceedings of the 2012 ACM Conference on Computer and Communications Security (New York, NY, USA, 2012), CCS '12, ACM, pages 217 - 228 | - "Appguard fine-grained policy enforcement for untrusted AndroidTM applications", BACKES, M.; GERLING, S.; HAMMER, C.; MAFFEI, M.; VON STYP-REKOWSKY, P, Data Privacy Management and Autonomous Spontaneous Security, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, pages 213 - 231 | - "Automatically securing permission-based software by reducing the attack surface: An application to Android", BARTEL, A.; KLEIN, J.; LE TRAON, Y.; MONPERRUS, M, Proceedings of the 27th IEEE/ACM International Conference on Automated Software Engineering (New York, NY, USA, 2012), ASE 2012, ACM, pages 274 - 277 | - BLASING, T.; BATYUK, L.; SCHMIDT, A.-D.; CAMTEPE, S; ALBAYRAK, S, "An AndroidTM application sandbox system for suspicious software detection. In Malicious and Unwanted Software (MALWARE", 2010 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (201010), pages 55 - 62 | - "Crowdroid: Behavior-based malware detection system for Android", BURGUERA, I.; ZURUTUZA, U.; NADJM-TEHRANI, S, Proceedings of the 1st ACM Workshop on Security and Privacy in Smartphones and Mobile Devices (New York, NY, USA, 2011), SPSM '11, ACM, pages 15 - 26 | - CHANDOLA, V.; BANERJEE, A.; KUMAR, V, "Anomaly detection: A survey", ACM COMPUT. SURV., (200907), vol. 41, no. 3 | - "TaintDroid: An information-flow tracking system for realtime privacy monitoring on smartphones", ENCK, W.; GILBERT, P.; CHUN, B.-G.; COX, L. P.; JUNG, J.; MCDANIEL, P.; SHETH, A. N, Proceedings of the 9th USENIX Conference on Operating Systems Design and Implementation (Berkeley, CA, USA, 2010), OSDI'10, USENIX ASSOCIATION, pages 1 - 6 | - "AndroidTM permissions demystified", FELT, A. P.; CHIN, E.; HANNA, S.; SONG, D.; WAGNER, D, Proceedings of the 18th ACM Conference on Computer and Communications Security (New York, NY, USA, 2011), CCS '11, ACM, pages 627 - 638 | - "AndroidTM permissions: User attention, comprehension, and behavior", FELT, A. P.; HA, E.; EGELMAN, S.; HANEY, A.; CHIN, E.; WAGNER, D, Proceedings of the Eighth Symposium on Usable Privacy and Security (New York, NY, USA, 2012), SOUPS '12, ACM | - "A sense of self for Unix processes", FORREST, S.; HOFMEYR, S. A.; SOMAYAJI, A.; LONGSTAFF, T. A, Proceedings of the 1996 IEEE Symposium on Security and Privacy (Washington, DC, USA, 1996), SP '96, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, page 120 | - GODEFROID, P.; LEVIN, M. Y.; MOLNAR, D, "Automated whitebox fuzz testing", PROCEEDINGS OF NETWORK AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS SECURITY (NDSS 2008, (200807), pages 151 - 166 | - GODEFROID, P.; LEVIN, M. Y.; MOLNAR, D, "Sage: Whitebox fuzzing for security testing", QUEUE, (201201), vol. 20, pages 20 - 20 | - "Checking app behavior against app descriptions", GORLA, A.; TAVECCHIA, I.; GROSS, F.; ZELLER, A, Proceedings of the 36th International Conference on Software Engineering (New York, NY, USA, 2014), ICSE 2014, ACM, pages 1025 - 1035 | - "Detecting anomalous and unknown intrusions against programs", GOSH, A. K.; WANKEN, J.; CHARRON, F, Proceedings of the 14th Annual Computer Security Applications Conference (Washington, DC, USA, 1998), ACSAC '98, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, page 259 | - "PUMA: Programmable UI-automation for large-scale dynamic analysis of mobile apps", HAO, S.; LIU, B.; NATH, S.; HALFOND, W. G.; GOVINDAN, R, Proceedings of the 12th Annual International Conference on Mobile Systems, Applications, and Services (New York, NY, USA, 2014), MobiSys '14, ACM, pages 204 - 217 | - "Automating GUI testing for AndroidTM applications", HU, C.; NEAMTIU, Proceedings of the 6th International Workshop on Automation of Software Test (New York, NY, USA, 2011), AST '11, ACM, pages 77 - 83 | - "Robust anomaly detection using support vector machines", HU, W.; LIAO, Y.; VEMURI, V. R, Proceedings of the International Conference on Machine Learning, MORGAN KAUFMANN PUBLISHERS INC, (2003), pages 282 - 289 | - "Learning patterns from Unix process execution traces for intrusion detection", LEE, W.; STOLFO, S. J.; CHAN, P. K, AAAI Workshop on AI Approaches to Fraud Detection and Risk Management, AAAI PRESS, (1997), pages 50 - 56 | - "Dynodroid: An input generation system for AndroidTM apps", MACHIRY, A.; TAHILIANI, R.; NAIK, M, Proceedings of the 2013 9th Joint Meeting on Foundations of Software Engineering (New York, NY, USA, 2013), ESEC/FSE 2013, ACM, pages 224 - 234 | - "A whitebox approach for automated security testing of AndroidTM applications on the cloud", MAHMOOD, R.; ESFAHANI, N.; KACEM, T.; MIRZAEI, N.; MALEK, S.; STAVROU, A., Proceedings of the 7th International Workshop on Automation of Software Test (Piscataway, NJ, USA, 2012), AST '12, IEEE PRESS, pages 22 - 28 | - "An empirical study of the reliability of UNIX utilities", MILLER, B. P.; FREDRIKSEN, L.; SO, B, Commun, ACM, (199012), vol. 33, pages 32 - 44 | - MONKEY: UI/APPLICATION EXERCISER, (20150201), URL: http://developer. AndroidTM.com/tools/help/monkey.html | - "User-driven access control: Rethinking permission granting in modern operating systems", ROESNER, F.; KOHNO, T.; MOSHCHUK, A.; PARNO, B.; WANG, H. J.; COWAN, C, Proceedings of the 2012 IEEE Symposium on Security and Privacy (Washington, DC, USA, 2012), SP '12, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, pages 224 - 238 | - SALTZER, J.; SCHROEDER, M., "The protection of information in computer systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (197509), vol. 63, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/PROC.1975.9939, pages 1278 - 1308, XP002525829 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PROC.1975.9939 | - "A fast automaton-based method for detecting anomalous program behaviors", SEKAR, R.; BENDRE, M.; DHURJATI, D.; BOLLINENI, P, Proceedings of the 2001 IEEE Symposium on Security and Privacy (Washington, DC, USA, 2001), SP '01, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, page 144 | - SHABTAI, A.; KANONOV, U.; ELOVICI, Y.; GLEZER, C.; WEISS, Y, "andromaly'': a behavioral malware detection framework for AndroidTM devices", JOURNAL OF INTELLIGENT INFORMATION SYSTEMS, (2012), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/s10844-010-0148-x, pages 161 - 190, XP019998836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10844-010-0148-x | - "The user is not the enemy: Fighting malware by tracking user intentions", SHIRLEY, J.; EVANS, D, Proceedings of the 2008 Workshop on New Security Paradigms (New York, NY, USA, 2008), NSPW '08, ACM, pages 33 - 45 | - "Outside the closed world: On using machine learning for network intrusion detection", SOMMER, R.; PAXSON, V, Proceedings of the 2010 IEEE Symposium on Security and Privacy (Washington, DC, USA, 2010), SP '10, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, pages 305 - 316 | - SUTTON, M, APP STORES AND THE ILLUSION OF CONTROL PART, (201407), URL: http://research.zscaler.com/2014/07/and-mice-will-play-app-stores-and.html | - UI AUTOMATOR: UI TESTING, (20150210), URL: http://developer.AndroidTM.com/ tools/testing/testing_ui.html | - "Idea: Callee-site rewriting of sealed system libraries", VON STYP-REKOWSKY, P.; GERLING, S.; BACKES, M.; HAMMER, C, Engineering Secure Software and Systems, SPRINGER BERLIN, (2013), vol. 7781, pages 33 - 41 |