EP3274282 - SHEET CONVEYOR FOR TRANSPORTING A SHEET, METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING A SHEET IN A SHEET CONVEYOR, INKJET PRINTING APPARATUS COMPRISING THE SHEET CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Production Printing Netherlands B.V. Van der Grintenstraat 10 5914 HH Venlo / NL | [2020/47] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Canon Production Printing Netherlands B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | ||
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states OCE-Technologies B.V. P.O. 101 St.Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIETBERGEN, Mark St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Canon Production Printing IP Department Canon Production Printing Netherlands B.V. Van der Grintenstraat 10 5914 HH Venlo / NL | [2021/28] |
Former [2018/05] | OCE IP Department St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 16710990.9 | 22.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016EP56226 | Priority number, date | EP20150160687 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15160687 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016150943 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3274282 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3274282 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/36, B65H5/22, B65H29/24, B65H29/52, B65H29/70 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B65H29/242 (EP,US);
B41J13/103 (US);
B65H29/52 (EP,US);
B65H29/66 (US);
B65H29/70 (EP,US);
B65H5/224 (EP,US);
B65H5/36 (EP,US);
B65H2220/09 (EP,US);
B65H2301/44735 (EP,US);
B65H2301/51214 (EP,US);
B65H2301/517 (EP,US);
B65H2404/2691 (EP,US);
B65H2404/62 (EP,US);
B65H2511/214 (EP,US);
B65H2513/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2301/44735, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2301/44735, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2511/214, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/01 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/05] | B65H5/36, B65H5/22, B65H29/24, B65H29/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOGENFÖRDERER ZUM FÖRDERN EINER BAHN, VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORT EINES BLATTES IN EINEM BOGENFÖRDERER, TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM BOGENFÖRDERER | [2020/52] | English: | SHEET CONVEYOR FOR TRANSPORTING A SHEET, METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING A SHEET IN A SHEET CONVEYOR, INKJET PRINTING APPARATUS COMPRISING THE SHEET CONVEYOR | [2018/05] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR DE FEUILLES, PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSPORTER UNE FEUILLE SUR UN TEL TRANSPORTEUR ET APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE COMPRENANT LEDIT TRANSPORTEUR | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/05] | BLATTFÖRDERER ZUM FÖRDERN EINES BLATTES, VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORT EINES BLATTES IN EINEM BLATTFÖRDERER, TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM BLATTFÖRDERER | ||
Former [2018/05] | TRANSPORTEUR DE FEUILLE POUR TRANSPORTER UNE FEUILLE, PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSPORTER UNE FEUILLE DANS UN TRANSPORTEUR DE FEUILLE, APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE COMPRENANT LE TRANSPORTEUR DE FEUILLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 09.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2016 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | GB | 22.03.2022 | IE | 22.03.2022 | LU | 22.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2009212497 (KAWAGUCHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 7,12; | [A]US2010109235 (SUGIYAMA YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US8322717 (DE JONG JOANNES N M [US], et al) [A] 1,15* the whole document * |