EP3271192 - SECURITY ELEMENT AND SECURITY DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oberthur Fiduciaire SAS 7 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLOL, Stéphane 15 rue du Commandant Genneau 77160 Provins / FR | 02 /
THIERRY, Yvan 6 rue du Gué Blandin 77320 Jouy Sur Morin / FR | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16711178.0 | 11.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016EP55371 | Priority number, date | FR20150052120 | 16.03.2015 Original published format: FR 1552120 | [2018/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016146551 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271192 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/342, B42D25/346, B42D25/351, B42D25/355, B42D25/373 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B42D25/355 (EP,KR);
B42D25/373 (EP,KR);
B42D25/324 (KR,RU);
B42D25/342 (EP);
B42D25/346 (EP);
B42D25/351 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | B42D25/324, B42D25/351, B42D25/355, B42D25/373 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT UND SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT | [2018/04] | English: | SECURITY ELEMENT AND SECURITY DOCUMENT | [2018/04] | French: | ELEMENT DE SECURITE ET DOCUMENT SECURISE | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 14.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE19650759 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,11,13,16,21-23 * column 2, lines 18-22 * * column 4, lines 1-28; figures 1,5 * [A] 4,5,10,12,14,15,17-20 [I] 2,6-8; | [XAI]WO03053713 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,12-23 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 9 * * page 5, lines 22 - 25 * * page 18, lines 8 - 18 * * page 20, lines 4 - 7; figure - * [A] 11[I] 6-8; | [XI]DE102006050047 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,12-16,20-23 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] - [0098] , [0101] , [0103] , [0104]; figures 1,13 * [I] 3,6-8,17-19; | [XI]DE102007034716 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-11,13,15-23 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0021] , [0023] , [0025] , [0026] , [0028] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0042] , [0047] , [0058] , [0060] , [0061] , [0066] , [0069] , [0071]; figure -; claims 1-6, 8, 10, 11, 18 - 20 * [I] 4,6,8,12,14 | by applicant | EP0059056 | EP0319157 | WO9308327 | EP0659587 | WO9904983 | WO03095188 | EP1674286 | EP0998396 | WO2007020370 | WO2007141459 | EP1503903 | WO2013160880 |