EP3264916 - EXTRACTION AND CONCENTRATION OF FOOD FLAVOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrus Junos S.a r.l. 1, rue Jean Piret 2350 Luxembourg / LU | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLENO, Yannick 73 avenue Franklin Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16712236.5 | 07.03.2016 | [2018/02] | WO2016EP54826 | Priority number, date | LU20150092675 | 06.03.2015 Original published format: LU 92675 | LU20150092677 | 09.03.2015 Original published format: LU 92677 | [2018/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016142352 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264916 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3264916 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23L13/30, A23L17/20, A23L2/56, A23L27/10, A23L27/12, A23L27/26, A23L27/29 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
A23L2/56 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/115 (EP,KR,US);
A23L13/30 (EP,KR,US);
A23L17/20 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/12 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/24 (KR);
A23L27/26 (EP,US);
A23L27/29 (EP,US);
A23L5/17 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRAKTION UND KONZENTRATION VON LEBENSMITTEL-AROMEN. | [2018/51] | English: | EXTRACTION AND CONCENTRATION OF FOOD FLAVOURS | [2018/02] | French: | EXTRACTION ET CONCENTRATION DE SAVEURS ALIMENTAIRES | [2018/02] |
Former [2018/02] | EXTRAKTION UND KONZENTRATION VON LEBENSMITTELAROMEN | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 05.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 07.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2016 | AL | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 07.03.2016 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 07.03.2016 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]CN102613621 ; | [XA]CN1554290 ; | [XA]KR20100126935 ; | [T]CN104664296 ; | [A]GB617776 (HARRY ALFRED NOYES) [A] 1-16 * page 5, lines 5-20; claim - *; | [A]CH511567 (STRUTHERS SCIENTIFIC INT CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [XA]EP0040178 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * claim - * [A] 1-14; | [XA]EP0110638 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 15,16 * page 3, lines 27-31; examples I-III; claims 1,2,3,5,26,27 * * pages 13,14,19 * [A] 1-14; | [A]US5653163 (COGAT PIERRE OLIVIER [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2911474 (VATELIS SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPLI [FR]) [A] 1-16 * page 7, lines 25-32 *; | [A]WO2010066061 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH], et al) [A] 2-4* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2013087795 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR]) [A] 2-4 * pages 1,3; claim - *; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 72, Database accession no. 2012-N86843, XP002750643 & CN102613621 A 20120801 (SHANDONG SHUN GARDEN JUJUBE IND CO LTD) [X] 15,16 * abstract * [A] 1-14 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 23, Database accession no. 2005-215668, XP002750644 & CN1554290 A 20041215 (GUO Y) [X] 15,16 * abstract * [A] 1-14 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 03, Database accession no. 2010-Q52673, XP002750741 & KR20100126935 A 20101203 (RED COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [X] 15,16 * abstract * [A] 1-14 | [A] - MULLER J G, "FREEZE CONCENTRATION of Food Liquids: THEORY, PRACTICE, AND ECONOMICS", FOOD TECHNOLOGY,, (196701), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 49 - 61, XP001349591 [A] 1-16 * page 49; table 1 * | [T] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 61, Database accession no. 2015-46945K, XP002750645 & CN104664296 A 20150603 (SICHUAN CHUANNAN BREWING CO LTD) [T] 1-13 * abstract * |