EP3261450 - METHOD FOR THE ACCELERATED AGING OF RICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAINS-R&S S.r.l. Via Galileo Ferraris, 34 13100 Vercelli / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Grains-R&S S.R.L. Via Galileo Ferraris34 13100 Vercelli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIGNOLA, Francesco Vicolo Cusani 8 13100 Vercelli / IT | 02 /
VIGNOLA, Marcello GRAINS-R&S S.r.l. Via Galileo Ferraris 34 13100 Vercelli / IT | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Lissandrini, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via Pancaldo 68 37138 Verona / IT | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16712513.7 | 26.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016IB51057 | Priority number, date | IT2015VR00031 | 26.02.2015 Original published format: IT VR20150031 | [2018/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016135683 | Date: | 01.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261450 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261450 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23B9/02, A23L7/196 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
A23L7/196 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHLEUNIGTEN ALTERUNG VON REIS | [2018/01] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ACCELERATED AGING OF RICE | [2018/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE VIEILLISSEMENT ACCÉLÉRÉ DU RIZ | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 31.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2016 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.08.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4233327 (ANDO MOMOFUKU ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 36; table 1 *; | [A]US2004081577 (MACALUSO VIRGIL J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] * | [A] - K. R. BHATTACHARYA, "Process for Accelerated Aging of Rice", CEREAL FOODS WORLD, US, (20130101), vol. 58, no. 1, doi:10.1094/CFW-58-1-0019, ISSN 0146-6283, pages 19 - 22, XP055220438 [A] 1-13 * page 20, column left, paragraph 3 - page 21, column middle; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/CFW-58-1-0019 | [A] - GUJRAL H S ET AL, "Effect of accelerated aging on the physicochemical and textural properties of brown and milled rice", JOURNAL OF FOOD ENGINEERING, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, vol. 59, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S0260-8774(02)00438-7, ISSN 0260-8774, (20030901), pages 117 - 121, (20030901), XP027458884 [A] 1-13 * page 117, paragraph 2.1 - page 118 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0260-8774(02)00438-7 | [A] - Q T Le ET AL, "Head rice yield, pasting property and correlations of accelerated paddy rice aging properties by microwave heating conditions", International Food Research Journal, vol. 21, no. 2, (20140101), pages 703 - 712, URL: http://www.ifrj.upm.edu.my/21 (02) 2014/38 IFRJ 21 (02) 2014 Sirichai 372.pdf, XP055220249 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 704, column right, paragraph Materials and Methods - page 705, column left * | [A] - JAISUT D ET AL, "Accelerated aging of jasmine brown rice by high-temperature fluidization technique", FOOD RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, BARKING, GB, vol. 42, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.FOODRES.2009.02.011, ISSN 0963-9969, (20090601), pages 674 - 681, (20090211), XP026090876 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodres.2009.02.011 | [A] - KALPANA RAYAGURU ET AL, "OPTIMIZATION OF PROCESS VARIABLES FOR ACCELERATED AGING OF BASMATI RICE", JOURNAL OF FOOD QUALITY., US, (20110201), vol. 34, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1745-4557.2010.00366.x, ISSN 0146-9428, pages 56 - 63, XP055220466 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1745-4557.2010.00366.x |