EP3268053 - MULTIPLE-BORE SOLUTE CARTRIDGE CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Cleveland Clinic Foundation 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44195 / US | For all designated states Parker Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, OH 44124 / US | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSS, Joseph 9500 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44195 / US | 02 /
RESENDES, Paul 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124 / US | 03 /
BANCO, Gino 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124 / US | 04 /
SYLVESTER, Andrew 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2018/03] | Williams, Bryn David Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16712609.3 | 14.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US22279 | Priority number, date | US201562132589P | 13.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562132589 P | US201562132618P | 13.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562132618 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016149177 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3268053 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3268053 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/02 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A61G12/008 (EP,KR,US);
C02F9/20 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/687 (KR,US);
A61G12/001 (KR,US);
A61L2/0017 (KR,US);
A61L2/022 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2/26 (US);
A61L9/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/008 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/325 (KR);
C02F1/4695 (KR);
C02F1/50 (KR,US);
A61L2202/21 (US);
C02F1/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F1/4691 (EP,US);
C02F1/68 (EP,US);
C02F2001/427 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (US);
C02F2103/026 (EP,US);
C02F2201/006 (EP,US);
C02F2201/008 (EP,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (US);
C02F2209/03 (EP,US);
C02F2209/05 (EP,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2301/043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGER FÜR KARTUSCHEN MIT LÖSLICHER SUBSTANZ MIT MEHREREN LÖCHERN | [2018/03] | English: | MULTIPLE-BORE SOLUTE CARTRIDGE CARRIER | [2018/03] | French: | SUPPORT DE CARTOUCHE DE SOLUTÉ À PLUSIEURS TROUS | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 19.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006169719 (BUI XUAN S [US]); | [X]US2009321339 (SUZUKI YASUJI [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2447697 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]); | [X]US2013224878 (WILSON GARETH [GB], et al); | [I]US2014124430 (HERGES KNUT [DE], et al) | Examination | US2006204405 |