EP3297598 - PACIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avanix S.r.l. Via Sporla 21 24020 Scanzorosciate (Bergamo) / IT | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALLERI, Giuseppe c/o Avanix S.r.l. Via Sporla 21 24020 Scanzorosciate (Bergamo) / IT | 02 /
BRIGNOLI, Maurizio c/o Avanix S.r.l. Via Sporla 21 24020 Scanzorosciate (Bergamo) / IT | 03 /
MALTESE, Michele c/o Avanix S.r.l. Via Sporla 21 24020 Scanzorosciate (Bergamo) / IT | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Gamba, Alessandro Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16713073.1 | 15.02.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016IB50797 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB00672 | 19.05.2015 Original published format: IT UB20150672 | [2018/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016185294 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3297598 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3297598 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61J17/00 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
A61J17/001 (EP,US);
A61B5/097 (EP);
A61B5/4815 (EP);
A61B5/6891 (EP);
A61J17/113 (EP,US);
A61B2503/04 (EP);
A61B2560/0242 (EP);
A61B2560/0266 (EP);
A61B5/067 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUCKEL | [2018/13] | English: | PACIFIER | [2018/13] | French: | TÉTINE | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 18.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2016 | AL | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 15.02.2016 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009024004 (YANG CHANG-MING [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2009198275 (GODOWN DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2012277794 (KOUNTOTSIS THEODOSIOS [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1A,1B,1C *; | [A]CN203075245U (SHENZHEN ZIFU TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]CN104257355 (DONG MEI) [A] 1 * abstract * |