EP3259381 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPONENT BY THERMAL SPRAYING AND INSTALLATION FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPONENT WITH A DEVICE FOR THERMAL SPRAYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFACKER, Oliver Berkaer Straße 40 14199 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KRÜGER, Ursus Krampnitzer Weg 11 14089 Berlin / DE | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 16713410.5 | 30.03.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016EP56886 | Priority number, date | DE201510206892 | 16.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015206892 | [2017/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016165938 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259381 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3259381 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/04, B22F3/105, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B22D23/00, B22F3/115, B29C64/153 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
B22F3/115 (EP,CN,US);
B22D23/003 (EP,US);
B22F10/00 (CN);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/37 (EP,CN,US);
B22F3/003 (CN);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,CN,US);
C23C24/04 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/49 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/28, B22F3/115 (US,CN,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/115, B22F3/003 (CN,EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/52] | C23C24/04, B22F3/105, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BAUTEILS DURCH THERMISCHES SPRITZEN UND ANLAGE ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BAUTEILS MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM THERMISCHEN SPRITZEN | [2017/52] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPONENT BY THERMAL SPRAYING AND INSTALLATION FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPONENT WITH A DEVICE FOR THERMAL SPRAYING | [2017/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT PAR PULVÉRISATION THERMIQUE ET INSTALLATION POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF POUR LA PULVÉRISATION THERMIQUE | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 11.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2016 | AL | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MK | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MK | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.03.2016 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0490546 (WEISS LEE E [US], et al) [X] 11,14 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 20; figure 2 * [I] 12,13; | [X]US2002069996 (COLLINS DAVID ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1; claims 1-20 *; | [XAI]WO2004091907 (AHC OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * claims 1-18 * [A] 11-14 [I] 2,5-10; | [AD]DE102009049707 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-14* paragraph [0025]; claims 1-14 * | by applicant | DE102006014835 | DE102009049707 |