EP3256645 - ARTIFICIAL LAWN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/51] | SUBSTRUCTURE FOR AN ARTIFICIAL LAWN | ||
[2020/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tarkett Sports B.V. Galliërsweg 35A 5349 AT Oss / NL | [2021/03] |
Former [2017/51] | For all designated states Desso Sports B.V. Postbus 215 5349 AE Oss / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONING, Ronald Kostverlorenstraat 1 2042 PA Zandvoort / NL | 02 /
VAN REIJEN, Peter c/o Desso Sports B.V. Postbus 215 5349 AE Oss / NL | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16714567.1 | 05.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016NL50083 | Priority number, date | NL20152014271 | 10.02.2015 Original published format: NL 2014271 | [2017/51] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016129995 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3256645 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3256645 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E01C13/02, E01C13/08 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
E01C13/02 (EP,US);
E01C13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTRASEN | [2020/27] | English: | ARTIFICIAL LAWN | [2020/27] | French: | GAZON ARTIFICIEL | [2020/27] |
Former [2017/51] | UNTERSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN KUNSTRASEN | ||
Former [2017/51] | SUBSTRUCTURE FOR AN ARTIFICIAL LAWN | ||
Former [2017/51] | INFRASTRUCTURE POUR PELOUSE ARTIFICIELLE | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 04.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2016 | AL | 26.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | ES | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | IT | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | IE | 05.02.2021 | LU | 05.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.02.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 05.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 05.02.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 05.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 05.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 05.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
LU | 05.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
IT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
ES | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2013009174 (DESSO SPORTS SYSTEMS N V [BE], et al) [YD] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005042394 (SAWYER DANIEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]NL2009968C (ORANJEWOUD REALISATIE B V) [A] 1-29 * pages 9-12; figure - *; | [A]WO2008051553 (FIELDTURF TARKETT INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-29 * paragraphs [0015] - [0030]; figure - *; | [A]DE202009009767U (MOOSDORF HEIDI [DE], et al) [A] 1,24-28 * columns 40-95; figures 8,1 *; | [A]US2004086664 (SEATON REED [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0373282 | WO2016099253 | by applicant | NL1021171C | GB2072022 | WO2006007862 | NL1013987C | NL1016193C | EP1428935 | EP0093008 | EP1462572 | WO2013009174 | NL2009968C | FR2395357 | US2004086664 | DE3835880 | US5540960 |