EP3277298 - IMPLANTABLE INTESTINAL REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE GRENOBLE ALPES 621 Avenue Centrale 38400 Saint Martin d'Hères / FR | For all designated states Centre Hospitalier Universitaire Grenoble Hôpital Nord Bd de la Chantourne BP217 38043 La Tronche / FR | [2022/07] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states Université Grenoble Alpes 621 avenue Centrale 38400 Saint-Martin-d'Hères / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre Hospitalier Universitaire Grenoble Hôpital Nord Bd de la Chantourne BP217 38043 La Tronche / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CINQUIN, Philippe 266 chemin de la Touvières 38330 Saint Nazaires Les Eymes / FR | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Dominique Chemin du Ruisseau de Montfort 38920 Crolles / FR | 03 /
MAURIN, Max 11 allée du bouilleur de cru 38240 Meylan / FR | 04 /
MARTIN, Donald 18 chemin du platant 38610 Gieres / FR | 05 /
EL ICHI RIBAULT, Sarra 94 rue Nicolas Garnier 69100 VILLEURBANNE / FR | 06 /
ZEBDA, Abdelkader 43 rue du général ferrié 38100 Grenoble / FR | 07 /
ALCARAZ, Jean-Pierre 522 rue Belledonne 38530 Pontcharra / FR | 08 /
RECHE, Fabian La Gorge 38190 Sainte Agnes / FR | 09 /
TUVIGNON, Patrick 61 bd Alsace Lorraine 81000 Albi / FR | 10 /
THELU, Jacques 91 rue des Libellules CIDEX 115C 38920 Crolles / FR | 11 /
LE GOUELLEC, Audrey 2150 route d'Uriage 38410 Uriage / FR | 12 /
TOUSSAINT, Bertrand 19 Route de Grenoble Hameau des Charmettes n°9 38120 Saint Egreve / FR | [2022/38] |
Former [2018/06] | 01 /
CINQUIN, Philippe 266 chemin de la Touvières 38330 Saint Nazaires Les Eymes / FR | ||
02 /
SCHNEIDER, Dominique 46 rue paul langevin 38400 Saint Martin D'heres / FR | |||
03 /
MAURIN, Max 11 allée du bouilleur de cru 38240 Meylan / FR | |||
04 /
MARTIN, Donald 18 chemin du platant 38610 Gieres / FR | |||
05 /
EL ICHI, Sarra 28 rue joseph savoyat 38110 La Tour Du Pin / FR | |||
06 /
ZEBDA, Abdelkader 43 rue du général ferrié 38100 Grenoble / FR | |||
07 /
ALCARAZ, Jean-Pierre 522 rue Belledonne 38530 Pontcharra / FR | |||
08 /
RECHE, Fabian La Gorge 38190 Sainte Agnes / FR | |||
09 /
TUVIGNON, Patrick 61 bd Alsace Lorraine 81000 Albi / FR | |||
10 /
THELU, Jacques 91 rue des Libellules CIDEX 115C 38920 Crolles / FR | |||
11 /
LE GOUELLEC, Audrey 2150 route d'Uriage 38410 Uriage / FR | |||
12 /
TOUSSAINT, Bertrand 19 Route de Grenoble Hameau des Charmettes n°9 38120 Saint Egreve / FR | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | Hautier IP - MC/EP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | ||
Former [2018/06] | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16714856.8 | 04.04.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016EP57304 | Priority number, date | FR20150052927 | 03.04.2015 Original published format: FR 1552927 | [2018/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156612 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277298 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277298 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A61F2/00, A61L31/16, A61K9/00, A61M31/00 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
A61M31/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/6871 (EP,US);
A61B5/6873 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61L31/042 (US);
A61L31/14 (US);
A61L31/146 (US);
A61L31/16 (US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
B01D69/144 (EP,US);
A61L2300/43 (US);
A61L2400/18 (US);
A61M2210/1053 (US);
A61M2210/1057 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARER INTESTINALER REAKTOR | [2018/06] | English: | IMPLANTABLE INTESTINAL REACTOR | [2018/06] | French: | REACTEUR INTESTINAL IMPLANTABLE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 26.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | IT | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | NL | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | NO | 21.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | IE | 04.04.2023 | LU | 04.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
IE | 04.04.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002103522 (SWOYER JOHN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2004213825 (LEVY MARK M [IL]) [X] 1,2,7-10,18 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,11-16; | [XI]US2004249362 (LEVINE ANDY H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,17,18 * the whole document * [I] 4,5,10,12-16; | [Y]WO2007092390 (BARONOVA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008115411 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [Y] 10* the whole document *; | [XI]US2009035351 (BERGLUND JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,18 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,10-17; | [Y]US2010063518 (BAKER RANDAL S [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0200775 | WO2005107786 | WO2008115428 | WO2008115411 | WO2010021752 | WO2010042203 | FR3019384 |