EP3254403 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A KEY IN A PROGRAMMABLE HARDWARE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERLI, Dominik Johannes-Knebel-Str. 10 86609 Donauwörth / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16715262.8 | 24.03.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016EP56620 | Priority number, date | DE201510206643 | 14.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015206643 | [2017/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016165930 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254403 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, G09C1/00, H03K19/177, G06F21/76 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G09C1/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L9/0861 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L9/0877 (KR,US);
G06F21/76 (CN);
H03K19/17768 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L2209/12 (KR);
H04L9/0643 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES SCHLÜSSELS IN EINEM PROGRAMMIERBAREN HARDWAREMODUL | [2017/50] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A KEY IN A PROGRAMMABLE HARDWARE MODULE | [2017/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UNE CLÉ DANS UN MODULE MATÉRIEL PROGRAMMABLE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 09.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2020 | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 26.09.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 13.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5970142 (ERICKSON CHARLES R [US]) [X] 1,14 * column 4, line 65 - column 8, line 31 * [I] 2-13; | [XI]WO0049717 (XILINX INC [US]) [X] 1,14 * page 6, lines 4-27; figures 1-4 * * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 19; figures 6a, 6b * [I] 2-13; | [A]US6996713 (TRIMBERGER STEPHEN M [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XI]US7716497 (TRIMBERGER STEPHEN M [US]) [X] 1,14 * column 10, lines 7-24; figure 1 * [I] 2-13 |