EP3286976 - UPLINK LISTEN BEFORE TALK OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
MALLADI, Durga, Prasad 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 16715406.1 | 23.03.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016US23732 | Priority number, date | US201562150189P | 20.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562150189 P | US201615077587 | 22.03.2016 Original published format: US201615077587 | [2018/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016171832 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3286976 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W16/14, H04W72/14, H04W72/12 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/09] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | UPLINK-LISTEN-BEFORE-TALK-BETRIEB | [2018/09] | English: | UPLINK LISTEN BEFORE TALK OPERATION | [2018/09] | French: | OPÉRATION "ÉCOUTER AVANT DE PARLER" DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 05.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2014036818 (KOSKELA TIMO [FI], et al); | [Y]US2014335876 (RATASUK RAPEEPAT [US], et al); | [A]US2014362780 (MALLADI DURGA PRASAD [US], et al); |