EP3274699 - METHOD FOR TREATING FET SENSOR ARRAYS AND RESULTING SENSOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/05] | METHOD FOR TREATING A SEMICONDUCTOR SENSOR ARRAY DEVICE | ||
[2023/03] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, NL | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2023/51] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, James 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | 02 /
WAGGONER, Phil 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Scott 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Ziermann, Oliver Life Technologies GmbH Frankfurter Straße 129b 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2018/05] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16715410.3 | 24.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016US24013 | Priority number, date | US201562138537P | 26.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562138537 P | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016154438 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3274699 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3274699 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/414 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G01N27/4145 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B08B3/08 (CN,KR,US);
B05D3/00 (CN,US);
B05D5/12 (CN,US);
B08B3/10 (KR);
B08B9/08 (CN,US);
C11D1/22 (CN,US);
C11D3/162 (CN,US);
C11D3/3418 (CN,US);
C11D3/43 (CN,US);
C11D7/34 (CN,KR,US);
C11D7/5013 (CN,KR,US);
C11D7/5022 (CN,KR,US);
G01N27/414 (CN,US);
G01N27/4148 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | G01N27/414, C11D3/16, C11D3/37 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FET-SENSORARRAYS UND RESULTIERENDEN SENSORVORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING FET SENSOR ARRAYS AND RESULTING SENSOR DEVICES | [2023/03] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DES RÉSEAUX DE CAPTEURS DE FET ET DISPOSITIFS DE CAPTEURS RÉSULTANTS | [2023/03] |
Former [2018/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER HALBLEITERSENSORARRAYVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2018/05] | METHOD FOR TREATING A SEMICONDUCTOR SENSOR ARRAY DEVICE | ||
Former [2018/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF À RÉSEAU DE CAPTEURS À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 10.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0913181 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 43; | [Y]US6398875 (COTTE JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-44 * claims 6,7 * * column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]US6903064 (KASTURI CHANDRIKA [US], et al) [A] 43; | [A]US8657966 (KALYANKAR NIKHIL D [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 1 *; | [IY]WO2014160962 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-44 * the whole document * [Y] 1-44 | Examination | US2012045368 | WO2014111944 |