EP3271968 - AN AMPLITUDE COMPARISON MONOPULSE RADAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arralis Holdings Limited Suite 1203, 12/F Wing On House 71 Des Voeux Road Central / HK | [2020/35] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Arralis Holdings Limited Suite 1203, 12/F Wing On House 71 Des Voeux Road Central / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIE, Steven 166 Finaghy Road South Belfast BT10 0DH / GB | 02 /
HUMPHREY, Denver 176 Ballygarvey Road Broughshane Ballymena Co. Antrim BT43 7HD / GB | 03 /
GLEAVES, Michael 152 Glantan Golf Links Road Castletroy Co. Limerick V94 KPP2 / IE | 04 /
LUNN, Barry Kilballyowen Bruff Co. Limerick / IE | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Stott, James Edward Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2020/35] |
Former [2018/04] | Reedy, Orlaith PurdyLucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16715466.5 | 16.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016EP55655 | Priority number, date | EP20150159261 | 16.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15159261 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016146666 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3271968 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3271968 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q25/02, H01Q21/00, G01S13/44, H01Q3/24, G01S7/03, H01Q25/00, H01Q3/40 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
G01S13/4445 (EP,CN,US);
G01S7/03 (EP,CN,US);
G01S13/4463 (EP,CN,US);
H01Q21/0031 (EP,CN,US);
H01Q25/008 (EP,CN,US);
H01Q25/02 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMPLITUDENVERGLEICH-MONOPULS-RADARSYSTEM | [2020/23] | English: | AN AMPLITUDE COMPARISON MONOPULSE RADAR SYSTEM | [2018/04] | French: | SYSTÈME RADAR MONOPULSÉ DE COMPARAISON D'AMPLITUDE | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/04] | MONOPULS-RADARSYSTEM MIT AMPLITUDENVERGLEICH | ||
Former [2018/04] | SYSTÈME RADAR À SIMPLE IMPULSION À COMPARAISON D'AMPLITUDE | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 03.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2016 | AL | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | MT | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | IE | 16.03.2021 | LU | 16.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.03.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
TR | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.03.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.03.2016 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | LT | 26.08.2020 | |
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 26.08.2020 | |
NO | 26.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US3979754 (ARCHER DONALD H) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]EP0227910 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [I] 1* page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 13; figure 2 *; | [I]US5162803 (CHEN CHAO C [US]) [I] 1-14 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 22; figure 4 *; | [X] - LING C C ET AL, "A 94 GHZ PLANAR MONOPULSE TRACKING RECEIVER", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19941001), vol. 42, no. 10, doi:10.1109/22.320766, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 1863 - 1871, XP000470320 [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [00II]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0VII]; figures 15-18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.320766 | [I] - LORA SCHULWITZ ET AL, "A Monopulse Rotman Lens Phased Array for Enhanced Angular Resolution", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM, 2007. IEEE/MTT-S INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PI, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0687-6, pages 1871 - 1874, XP031112327 [I] 1-3,14 * the whole document * | [I] - STEVEN CHRISTIE ET AL, "Liquid crystal based Rotman lens antenna with switchable monopulse patterns", MICROWAVE AND OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20131126), vol. 55, no. 11, doi:10.1002/mop.27919, ISSN 0895-2477, pages 2721 - 2726, XP055211961 [I] 1-3,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mop.27919 | by applicant | US3979754 |