EP3281426 - INTER-FREQUENCY LTE-D DISCOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/07] | INTER FREQUENCY LTE-D DISCOVERY | ||
[2021/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAVILDAR, Saurabha Rangrao c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BAGHEL, Sudhir Kumar c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GULATI, Kapil c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
PATIL, Shailesh c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
GAAL, Peter c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/33] |
Former [2018/07] | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16716338.5 | 21.03.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016US23417 | Priority number, date | US201562143626P | 06.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562143626 P | US201615074370 | 18.03.2016 Original published format: US201615074370 | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164162 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3281426 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3281426 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/00, H04W48/16 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04W8/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W48/12 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (CN,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,CN,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | H04W48/16 | ||
Former IPC [2018/07] | H04W8/00, H04W48/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LTE-D ENTDECKUNG ZWISCHEN FREQUENZEN | [2018/07] | English: | INTER-FREQUENCY LTE-D DISCOVERY | [2021/28] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE LTE-D INTERFRÉQUENTIELLE | [2018/07] |
Former [2018/07] | INTER FREQUENCY LTE-D DISCOVERY | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 26.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2021 | 02.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.12.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | IE | 21.03.2023 | LU | 21.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2013172755 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-7,10-17,20-27,30-37,40 * page 1 - page 5, line 17 * * page 10, line 7 - page 13, line 35 * * page 17, line 6 - page 18, line 32 * * page 22, line 9 - page 25, line 33 * * figures 2, 4 * [Y] 8,9,18,19,28,29,38,39; | [YA]US2014370904 (SMITH JACK ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 2-9,12-19,22-29,32-39 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0209] * [A] 1,10,11,20,21,30,31,40; | [YA]US2015043448 (CHATTERJEE DEBDEEP [US], et al) [Y] 2-10,12-20,22-30,32-40 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0094] * [A] 1,11,21,31; | [XY] - KYOCERA, "Intra-frequency and inter-frequency neighbor cell support", vol. RAN WG2, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140817 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-143755_INTRA_INTER_FREQUENCY_D2D, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140817), XP050794700 [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15,17,18,21-25,27,28,31-35,37,38 * Sections 1, 2.1, 2.3, 2.4 * [Y] 6,9,10,16,19,20,26,29,30,36,39,40 | [XY] - ETRI, "Consideration on Inter-PLMN discovery", vol. RAN WG3, no. Shanghai, China; 20141006 - 20141010, (20141005), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-142398, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20141005), XP050877671 [X] 1-5,11-15,21-25,31-35 * page 2 - page 3 * [Y] 6-10,16-20,26-30,36-40 | [XA] - ERICSSON, "D2D Broadcast Control Information and Related Procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20140519 - 20140523, (20140518), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-142401 D2D BROADCAST, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/RAN1/Docs/, (20140518), XP050789519 [X] 2-10,12-20,22-30,32-40 * page 2 - page 3 * * page 5 * * table 1 * [A] 1,11,21,31 | [T] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Running stage 2 CR TS 36.300 to capture agreement on eD2D", vol. RAN WG2, no. Beijing, China; 20150824 - 20150828, (20150914), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-153890_CR36300 ED2D, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_91/Docs/, (20150914), XP051023320 [T] * Section 23.11.3 * | Examination | - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "Multiple Tx Resource Pools for ProSe Discovery", vol. RAN WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20141117 - 20141121, (20141117), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-145211 MULTIPLE RESOURCE POOLS FOR DISCOVERY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20141117), XP050877292 | - NSN ET AL, "WAN protection by configurable D2D transmission power control", vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20140519 - 20140523, (20140518), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-142454, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/RAN1/Docs/, (20140518), XP050789572 | - ERICSSON, "Impact of D2D on UE Transmit RF Requirements", vol. RAN WG4, no. Athens, Greece; 20150209 - 20150213, (20150216), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-151172, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_74/Docs/, (20150216), XP050955821 | - ERICSSON, "D2D UE RF Transmit Requirements for Multiple Carriers", vol. RAN WG4, no. Anaheim, CA, US; 20151116 - 20151120, (20151116), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-157161, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN4/Docs/, (20151116), XP051009865 |