EP3280640 - PASSENGER ACCOMMODATION SYSTEMS INCLUDING PARTITION WALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Seats USA LLC 2000 Weber Drive Gainesville, TX 76240 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2018/07] | For all designated states Zodiac Seats US LLC 2000 Weber Drive Gainesville, TX 76240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLIOZ, Victor c/o Zodiac Seats US LLC 2000 Weber Drive Gainesville, TX 76240 / US | 02 /
JAMSON, Hugo c/o Zodiac Seats US LLC 2000 Weber Drive Gainesville, TX 76240 / US | 03 /
KARATSOLI, Lito c/o Zodiac Seats US LLC 2000 Weber Drive Gainesville, TX 76240 / US | 04 /
MILES, Luke c/o Zodiac Seats US LLC 2000 Weber Drive Gainesville, TX 76240 / US | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Phillips & Leigh LLP 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16716416.9 | 04.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016US25833 | Priority number, date | US201562144728P | 08.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144728 P | US201562144737P | 08.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144737 P | US201562144757P | 08.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144757 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016164293 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3280640 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, B64D11/04 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
B64D11/0023 (EP,CN,US);
B64D11/0601 (US);
B64D11/0007 (US);
B64D11/04 (EP,CN,US);
B64D11/06 (CN);
B64D11/0606 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Title | German: | PASSAGIERAUFNAHMESYSTEME MIT TRENNWÄNDEN | [2018/07] | English: | PASSENGER ACCOMMODATION SYSTEMS INCLUDING PARTITION WALLS | [2018/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ACCUEIL DE PASSAGERS COMPRENANT DES PAROIS DE SÉPARATION | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 03.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3168364 (NORBERT SCHAEFER-SELL) [X] 15,19 * column 3, line 15 - line 24; figure 1 * * column 4, line 3 - line 7; figure 2 * * column 4, line 14 - line 36; figure 4 *; | [A]US4597549 (RYAN JAMES M [US]) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0901963 (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2004217234 (JONES RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 2,4,5,10,12-14 * paragraph [0022]; figure 4 * [I] 11; | [XYI]FR2873349 (AIRBUS SAS [FR]) [X] 2,4,6,10,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 1,8 [I] 7; | [XI]US2006214057 (SAINT-JALMES BRUNO [FR], et al) [X] 2,4,10,12,13 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2; claim 3 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figure 5 * [I] 3,6,7,9; | [I]FR2886896 (AIRBUS SAS [FR]) [I] 15-18 * page 6, line 18 - line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102006003585 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE102007009500 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 15 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2010021594 (SINGAPORE AIRLINES LTD [SG], et al) [X] 15,20,21 * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 3; figures 2,3 * [Y] 1; | [A]US2012318822 (STRAUSS ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 15,19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2013105627 (ORSON BEN [US], et al) [X] 2-5,10-14 * paragraph [0029]; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2013136283 (DRIESSEN AEROSPACE GROUP NV [NL]) [X] 15 * paragraph [0033]; figure 2 * |