EP3423758 - COVER CHANNEL, COVER FRAME, INSULATING PANEL, AIR HANDLING UNIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COVER CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCHET, Samuel 23 Rue Saint Maurice 69008 Lyon / FR | 02 /
SERRA, Marc Au Châtelet 01300Andert et Condon / FR | 03 /
CARTON, Thomas 46 Impasse des Jardins 01200 Eloise / FR | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 16716672.7 | 03.03.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016IB00370 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149342 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423758 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423758 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/20, E04C2/292, E04C2/24, E04C2/38 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
E04C2/292 (EP,US);
F24F13/0263 (US);
E04B1/80 (US);
E04C2/243 (EP,US);
E04C2/246 (EP,US);
E04C2/38 (EP,US);
E04C2/384 (US);
E04C2/388 (US);
F24F13/0281 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | F24F13/20, E04B1/58, E04C2/292 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKKANAL, ABDECKRAHMEN, ISOLIERPLATTE, LUFTBEHANDLUNGSEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABDECKKANALS | [2019/02] | English: | COVER CHANNEL, COVER FRAME, INSULATING PANEL, AIR HANDLING UNIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COVER CHANNEL | [2019/02] | French: | CANAL DE COUVERTURE, CADRE DE COUVERTURE, PANNEAU ISOLANT, UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'AIR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CANAL DE COUVERTURE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 28.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | IT | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SE | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | IE | 03.03.2023 | LU | 03.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.03.2023 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.02.2023 | |
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3372520 (HENSEL ERICH E) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [I] 2-13; | [A]GB2168732 (HOESCH AG) [A] 1 * page 1, line 122 - page 2, line 91 * * figure - *; | [AD]WO0150068 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003009969 (HERBECK CHRISTIAN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] ** figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO2005024251 (SINGLETON MARK JAMES [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4 - page 6 * * figure - * | by applicant | WO0150068 |