EP3280787 - LUBRICANTS CONTAINING QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAHAGAN, Michael P. P.O. Box 88 Belper Derbyshire DE56 1QN / GB | 02 /
MIATT, Peter P.O. Box 88 Belper Derbyshire DE56 1QN / GB | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16716786.5 | 05.04.2016 | [2018/07] | WO2016US26010 | Priority number, date | US201562145206P | 09.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562145206 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164345 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3280787 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3280787 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/08, C10M169/04 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
C10M141/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10M169/048 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10M133/04 (US);
C10M133/16 (US);
C10M133/44 (US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10M2215/223 (US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10N2030/02 (US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2215/086, C10M2219/042 (US,CN,EP);
C10M2215/28, C10M2207/122 (CN,EP,US);
C10M2215/28, C10M2207/144 (US,CN,EP);
C10M2215/28, C10M2207/288 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTEL MIT QUATERNÄREN AMMONIUMVERBINDUNGEN | [2018/07] | English: | LUBRICANTS CONTAINING QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS | [2018/07] | French: | LUBRIFIANTS CONTENANT DES COMPOSÉS D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012177529 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0105] * * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2013133243 (ROEGER-GOEPFERT CORNELIA [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [IA]US2014057818 (BARTON WILLIAM R S [GB], et al) [I] 1-4,7-17 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0153] * * example -; claim - * [A] 5,6 | by applicant | US2191125 | US2719125 | US2719126 | US2760933 | US2765289 | US2836564 | US3087937 | US3087932 | US3172892 | US3367869 | US3372116 | US3381022 | US3471404 | US3634515 | US3749695 | US4136043 | US4171959 | US4191659 | US4234435 | US4285822 | CA1188704 | US4622158 | US4654403 | US4719023 | US4741848 | US4752416 | EP0355895 | US4957651 | US4959168 | US5157088 | US5254138 | US5256752 | US5298177 | US5354484 | US5395539 | US6200936 | WO0156968 | US6310009 | US6310011 | US6528458 | US6559105 | US6569818 | US2005065045 | US2007155636 | US2008113890 | US2008182770 | US2010197536 | US2012015855 | US2012021958 | US8153570 | US2012101012 | US2012122744 | US2012247514 | WO2012154708 | US8476207 | US8501674 | - "Transmission Options", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, (200107), pages 67 - 68 |