EP3277827 - FUNGAL CELLS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCTION OF VERY LONG CHAIN FATTY ACID DERIVED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biopetrolia AB Chalmers Tekniska Högskola 412 96 Göteborg / SE | [2021/12] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states Biopetrolia AB Chalmers Tekniska Högskola 412 96 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVID, Florian Eklandagatan 7 S-412 55 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
SIEWERS, Verena Kvillegatan 29 S-417 08 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
KRIVORUCHKO, Anastasia Kjellbergsgatan 5 S-411 32 Göteborg / SE | 04 /
WENNING, Leonie Sagogången 37 Lgh 224 S-422 45 Hisingsbacka / SE | 05 /
YU, Tao Hammarliden 8 S-412 62 Göteborg / SE | 06 /
ZHOU, Yong-Jin Uppstigen 121 S-412 80 Göteborg / SE | 07 /
NIELSEN, Jens Nedre Fogelbergsgatan 5 S-411 28 Göteborg / SE | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell Sweden AB Östermalmsgatan 87B 114 59 Stockholm / SE | [2021/12] |
Former [2018/06] | Aros Patent AB Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 16717489.5 | 01.04.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016SE50274 | Priority number, date | US201562142236P | 02.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562142236 P | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016159869 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277827 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277827 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
C12P7/6409 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/04 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/0008 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/6463 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y102/0105 (EP,CN,US);
C12Y203/01075 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PILZZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRODUKTEN AUS SEHR LANGKETTIGEN FETTSÄUREN | [2018/06] | English: | FUNGAL CELLS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCTION OF VERY LONG CHAIN FATTY ACID DERIVED PRODUCTS | [2018/06] | French: | CELLULES FONGIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDES GRAS À TRÈS LONGUE CHAÎNE | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 17.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2016 | AL | 24.03.2021 | AT | 24.03.2021 | CY | 24.03.2021 | CZ | 24.03.2021 | EE | 24.03.2021 | ES | 24.03.2021 | FI | 24.03.2021 | HR | 24.03.2021 | IT | 24.03.2021 | LT | 24.03.2021 | LV | 24.03.2021 | MC | 24.03.2021 | MK | 24.03.2021 | MT | 24.03.2021 | PL | 24.03.2021 | RO | 24.03.2021 | RS | 24.03.2021 | SI | 24.03.2021 | SK | 24.03.2021 | SM | 24.03.2021 | IE | 01.04.2021 | LU | 01.04.2021 | BG | 24.06.2021 | NO | 24.06.2021 | GR | 25.06.2021 | IS | 24.07.2021 | PT | 26.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.04.2016 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
MK | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.04.2016 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CY | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.04.2016 | |
AL | 24.03.2021 | ||
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SI | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
ES | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.03.2021 | |
AT | 24.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
MC | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
PL | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.07.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RO | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SK | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
PT | 26.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
CZ | 24.03.2021 | ||
EE | 24.03.2021 | ||
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.03.2021 | |
FI | 24.03.2021 | ||
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LT | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
SM | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LV | 24.03.2021 | ||
RS | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
BG | 24.06.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
GR | 25.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
HR | 24.03.2021 | ||
NO | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.03.2021 | |
NO | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0194565 (UNIV MIAMI [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * claims 15, 18 *; | [I]WO2008119082 (LS9 INC [US], et al) [I] 1-35 * figure 4; claims 1-8, 13-16, 117-123 *; | [I]WO2012087964 (CODEXIS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-35 * claims 1, 18, 31-34; sequence 3 *; | [Y]WO2015042306 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA]) [Y] 1-35 * claims 1-41 *; | [I] - WEERAWAT RUNGUPHAN ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of Saccharomyces cerevisiae for production of fatty acid-derived biofuels and chemicals", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, US, (20140101), vol. 21, doi:10.1016/j.ymben.2013.07.003, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 103 - 113, XP055279281 [I] 1-35 * Material and Methods; Conclusion;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2013.07.003 | [Y] - JUAN OCTAVIO VALLE-RODRÍGUEZ ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of Saccharomyces cerevisiae for production of fatty acid ethyl esters, an advanced biofuel, by eliminating non-essential fatty acid utilization pathways", APPLIED ENERGY., GB, (20140201), vol. 115, doi:10.1016/j.apenergy.2013.10.003, ISSN 0306-2619, pages 226 - 232, XP055279257 [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apenergy.2013.10.003 | [Y] - SHUOBO SHI ET AL, "Functional expression and characterization of five wax ester synthases in Saccharomyces cerevisiae and their utility for biodiesel production", BIOTECHNOLOGY FOR BIOFUELS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20120224), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1754-6834-5-7, ISSN 1754-6834, page 7, XP021119254 [Y] 1-35 * Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1754-6834-5-7 | by applicant | - AGAPHONOV, M.; ALEXANDROV, A., "Self-excising integrative yeast plasmid vectors containing an intronated recombinase gene", FEMS YEAST RES, (2014), vol. 14, pages 1048 - 1054 | - AKHTAR, M.K.; TURNER, N.J.; JONES, P.R., "Carboxylic acid reductase is a versatile enzyme for the conversion of fatty acids into fuels and chemical commoditie", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2013), vol. 110, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1216516110, pages 87 - 92, XP055096008 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1216516110 | - BEOPOULOS, A.; VERBEKE, J.; BORDES, F.; GUICHERD, M.; BRESSY, M.; MARTY, A.; NICAUD, J.-M., "Metabolic engineering for ricinoleic acid production in the oleaginous yeast Yarrowia lipolytica", APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (2014), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1007/s00253-013-5295-x, pages 251 - 262, XP009175403 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-013-5295-x | - BLAZECK, J.; LIU, L.; REDDEN, H.; ALPER, H., "Tuning gene expression in Yarrowia lipolytica by a hybrid promoter approach", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL, (2011), vol. 77, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.05763-11, pages 7905 - 7914, XP055291461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.05763-11 | - CHEN, D.C.; BECKERICH, J.M.; GAILLARDIN, C., "One-step transformation of the dimorphic yeast Yarrowia lipolytica.", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 48, pages 232 - 235 | - CRAMERI, A.; RAILLARD, S.A.; BERMUDEZ, E.; STEMMER, W.P., "DNA shuffling of a family of genes from diverse species accelerates directed evolution", NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, doi:doi:10.1038/34663, pages 288 - 291, XP055092965 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/34663 | - DENIC, V.; WEISSMAN, J.S., "A Molecular Caliper Mechanism for Determining Very Long-Chain Fatty Acid Length", CELL, (2007), vol. 130, doi:doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2007.06.031, pages 663 - 677, XP002506523 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CELL.2007.06.031 | - GAO, S.; HAN, L.; ZHU, L.; GE, M.; YANG, S.; JIANG, Y.; CHEN, D., "One-step integration of multiple genes into the oleaginous yeast Yarrowia lipolytica", BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (2014), vol. 36, pages 2523 - 2528 | - GIBSON, D.G.; YOUNG, L.; CHUANG, R.-Y.; VENTER, J.C.; HUTCHISON, C.A.; SMITH, H.O., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", NAT. METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1318, pages 343 - 345, XP055224105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1318 | - JAKOCIUNAS, T.; BONDE, I.; HERRGARD, M.; HARRISON, S.J.; KRISTENSEN, M.; PEDERSEN, L.E.; JENSEN, N.B.; STRUCKO, T.; KILDEGAARD, K., "EasyClone: Method for iterative chromosomal integration of multiple genes in Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", FEMS YEAST RES, (2014), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1111/1567-1364.12118, pages 238 - 248, XP055273409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1567-1364.12118 | - KALSCHEUER, R.; ST6VEKEN, T.; LUFTMANN, H.; MALKUS, U.; REICHELT, R.; STEINBIICHEL, A., "Neutral lipid biosynthesis in engineered Escherichia coli: jojoba oil-like wax esters and fatty acid butyl esters", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 72, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.72.2.1373-1379.2006, pages 1373 - 9, XP007903431 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.72.2.1373-1379.2006 | - KHOOMRUNG, S., CHUMNANPUEN, P., JANSA-ARD, S., STAISHLMAN, M., NOOKAEW, I., BOREN, "Rapid quantification of yeast lipid using microwave-assisted total lipid extraction and HPLC-CAD", ANAL. CHEM, (2013), vol. 85, pages 4912 - 4919 | - KHOOMRUNG S; CHUMNANPUEN P; JANSA-ARD S; NOOKAEW I; NIELSEN J, APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL., (20120509), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 1637 - 46 | - KRIVORUCHKO, A.; SERRANO-AMATRIAIN, C.; CHEN, Y.; SIEWERS, V.; NIELSEN, J., "Improving biobutanol production in engineered Saccharomyces cerevisiae by manipulation of acetyl-CoA metabolism", J. IND. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (2013), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1007/s10295-013-1296-0, pages 1051 - 1056, XP055086999 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10295-013-1296-0 | - LEDALL, M.T.; NICAUD, J.M.; GAILLARDIN, C., "Multiple copy integration in the yeast Yarrowia lipolytica", CURR. GENET., (1994), vol. 26, pages 38 - 44 | - MANS, R.; VAN ROSSUM, H.M.; WIJSMAN, M.; BACKX, A.; KUIJPERS, N.G.A.; VAN DEN BROEK, M.; DARAN-LAPUJADE, P.; PRONK, J.T.; VAN MARI, "CRISPR/Cas9: a molecular Swiss army knife for simultaneous introduction of multiple genetic modifications in Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", FEMS YEAST RES., (2015), vol. 15, XP002762726 | - MOOTZ, H.D.; SCH6RGENDORFER, K.; MARAHIEL, M.A., "Functional characterization of 4'-phosphopantetheinyl transferase genes of bacterial and fungal origin by complementation of Saccharomyces cerevisiae lys5.", FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT, (2002), vol. 213, pages 51 - 57, XP002319470 | - MUMBERG, D.; MULLER, R.; FUNK, M., "Yeast vectors for the controlled expression of heterologous proteins in different genetic backgrounds", GENE, (1995), vol. 156, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(95)00037-7, pages 119 - 122, XP004042399 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00037-7 | - PAN, R.; ZHANG, J.; SHEN, W.L.; TAO, Z.Q.; LI, S.P.; YAN, X., "Sequential deletion of Pichia pastoris genes by a self-excisable cassette", FEMS YEAST RES., (2011), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1567-1364.2011.00716.x, pages 292 - 298, XP055026362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1567-1364.2011.00716.x | - PARTOW, S.; SIEWERS, V.; BJORN, S.; NIELSEN, J.; MAURY, J., "Characterization of different promoters for designing a new expression vector in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", YEAST, (2010), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1002/yea.1806, pages 955 - 964, XP002733014 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.1806 | - PAUL, S.; GABLE, K.; BEAUDOIN, F.; CAHOON, E.; JAWORSKI, J.; NAPIER, J.A.; DUNN, T.M., "Members of the arabidopsis FAEl-like 3-ketoacyl-CoA synthase gene family substitute for the elop proteins of Saccharomyces cerevisiae.", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, pages 9018 - 9029 | - PULSIFER, I.P.; KLUGE, S.; ROWLAND, 0., "Arabidopsis LONG-CHAIN ACYL-COA SYNTHETASE 1 (LACS1), LACS2, and LACS3 facilitate fatty acid uptake in yeast.", PLANT PHYSIOL. BIOCHEM., (2012), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1016/j.plaphy.2011.10.003, pages 31 - 39, XP028339380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plaphy.2011.10.003 | - QUAN, J.; TIAN, J., "Circular Polymerase Extension Cloning of Complex Gene Libraries and Pathways", PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, page E6441 | - QUAN, J.; TIAN, J., "Circular polymerase extension cloning.", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2011), vol. 6, pages 242 - 251 | - SHI, S.; CHEN, Y.; SIEWERS, V.; NIELSEN, J., "Improving production of malonyl coenzyme A-derived metabolites by abolishing Snfl-dependent regulation of Accl.", MBIO, (2014), vol. 5 | - TEERAWANICHPAN, P.; QIU, X., "Fatty acyl-coA reductase and wax synthase from euglena gracilis in the biosynthesis of medium-chain wax esters", LIPIDS, (2010), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1007/s11745-010-3395-2, pages 263 - 273, XP055031160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-010-3395-2 | - THARAUD, C.; COSTES, C.; GAILLARDIN, C., "Secretion of human blood coagulation factor XIIIa by the yeast Yarrowia lipolytica", GENE, (1992), vol. 121, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(92)90168-O, pages 111 - 119, XP023540455 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(92)90168-O | - TRENKAMP, S.; MARTIN, W.; TIETJEN, K., "Specific and differential inhibition of very-long-chain fatty acid elongases from Arabidopsis thaliana by different herbicides", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 11903 - 11908 | - URBANOVA, K.; VRKOSLAV, V.; VALTEROVA, I.; HAKOVA, M.; CVAC'KA, J., "Structural characterization of wax esters by electron ionization mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (2012), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 204 - 213 | - VERDUYN, C.; POSTMA, E.; SCHEFFERS, W.A.; VAN DIJKEN, J.P., "Effect of benzoic acid on metabolic fluxes in yeasts: A continuous-culture study on the regulation of respiration and alcoholic fermentation", YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1002/yea.320080703, pages 501 - 517, XP008082716 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320080703 | - WAHLEN, B.D.; OSWALD, W.S.; SEEFELDT, L.C.; BARNEY, B.M., "Purification, characterization, and potential bacterial Wax production role of an nadph-dependent fatty aldehyde reductase from Marinobacter aquaeolei VT8.", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2009), vol. 75, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.02578-08, pages 2758 - 2764, XP008152441 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02578-08 | - WENZ, P.; SCHWANK, S.; HOJA, U.; SCHÜLLER, H.-J., "A downstream regulatory element located within the coding sequence mediates autoregulated expression of the yeast fatty acid synthase gene FAS2 by the FAS gene product", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, pages 4625 - 4632 | - WILLIS, R.M.; WAHLEN, B.D.; SEEFELDT, L.C.; BARNEY, B.M., "Characterization of a fatty acyl-CoA reductase from Marinobacter aquaeolei VT8: a bacterial enzyme catalyzing the reduction of fatty acyl-CoA to fatty alcohol.", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1021/bi2008646, pages 10550 - 10558, XP055064364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi2008646 | - ZHOU, Y.J.; GAO, W.; RONG, Q.; JIN, G.; CHU, H.; LIU, W.; YANG, W.; ZHU, Z.; LI, G.; ZHU, G., "Modular pathway engineering of diterpenoid synthases and the mevalonic acid pathway for miltiradiene production", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2012), vol. 134, doi:doi:10.1021/ja2114486, pages 3234 - 41, XP055058678 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja2114486 |