EP3294605 - INTERFACE ARRANGEMENT FOR DATA, SIGNAL AND/OR VOICE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRILL, Thomas Winterstrasse 16 30989 Gehrden / DE | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 16718355.7 | 25.04.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016EP59149 | Priority number, date | DE201510107230 | 08.05.2015 Original published format: DE102015107230 | [2018/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016180622 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294605 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3294605 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B61G5/10 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
B61G5/10 (EP,US);
H01B11/002 (US);
H01R27/02 (US);
H02G3/02 (US);
H01R13/04 (US);
H01R24/84 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE DATEN-, SIGNAL- UND/ODER SPRACHÜBERTRAGUNG | [2018/12] | English: | INTERFACE ARRANGEMENT FOR DATA, SIGNAL AND/OR VOICE TRANSMISSION | [2018/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DE SIGNAUX ET/OU DE LA PAROLE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 17.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2016 | AL | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | TR | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | GB | 25.04.2022 | IE | 25.04.2022 | LU | 25.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.04.2016 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
GB | 25.04.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.04.2016 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
GB | 25.04.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.04.2016 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
GB | 25.04.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
GB | 25.04.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
GB | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
GB | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102011079551 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * page 3, paragraph 0029 - page 4, paragraph 0037; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-9; | [A]DE19926058 (SCHARFENBERGKUPPLUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 12 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007054562 (PRILL THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, paragraph 0053 - page 9, paragraph 0099; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US3696758 (GODINEZ PETER A JR) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 50 - column 7, line 53; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2010241295 (COOPER JARED KLINEMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 0020 - page 7, paragraph 0057; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP2746129 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, paragraph 0021 - column 4, paragraph 0032; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2014163769 (OTSUBO TOM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 0013 - page 3, paragraph 0026; figures 1-4 * |