EP3289371 - RADIO FREQUENCY VOLUME COIL WITH IMPROVED SPACE AND ACCESS FOR USE IN A MAGNETIC RESONANCE EXAMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEUSSLER, Christoph c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
FINDEKLEE, Christian c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/30] |
Former [2018/10] | van Iersel, Hannie Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 16718374.8 | 26.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016EP59253 | Priority number, date | EP20150166023 | 30.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15166023 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016174012 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289371 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3289371 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34, G01R33/422, G01R33/48 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G01R33/34076 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (US);
G01R33/34 (RU);
G01R33/422 (EP,US);
G01R33/4808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZVOLUMENSPULE MIT VERBESSERTEM RAUM UND ZUGRIFF ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM MAGNETRESONANZUNTERSUCHUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/10] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY VOLUME COIL WITH IMPROVED SPACE AND ACCESS FOR USE IN A MAGNETIC RESONANCE EXAMINATION SYSTEM | [2018/10] | French: | BOBINE VOLUMIQUE À RADIOFRÉQUENCE AVEC ENCOMBREMENT ET ACCÈS AMÉLIORÉS DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME D'EXAMEN PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/10] | BOBINE VOLUMIQUE RADIOFRÉQUENCE À ESPACE ET ACCÈS AMÉLIORÉS POUR UTILISATION DANS UN SYSTÈME D'EXAMEN PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4837515 (NISHIHARA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, lines 28-59 * * column 7, lines 52-64 * * figures 6, 10 *; | [A]US2009206836 (EBERLER LUDWIG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043] ** figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2010036237 (EBERLEIN EVA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11,12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1, 7 * [I] 3,4,6,7,10; | [A]US2012169341 (MCKINNON GRAEME C [US]) [A] 1-5,8,9,11 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]US2012253174 (POPESCU STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,9,11 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 1-4, 7-9 * |