EP3294193 - CLEANING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLLOWS, Thomas c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 02 /
BEX-RUSSELL, William c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 03 /
STICKNEY, Timothy c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 04 /
COURTNEY, Stephen c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 05 /
GAMMACK, Peter c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Booth, Andrew Steven, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 16718895.2 | 25.04.2016 | [2018/12] | WO2016GB51148 | Priority number, date | GB20150008366 | 15.05.2015 Original published format: GB 201508366 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016185165 | Date: | 24.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3294193 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3294193 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/02, A61C17/22, A61C17/36 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A61C17/0202 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A61C17/221 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
A61C17/36 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A46B11/0017 (GB);
A46B13/04 (GB,KR,US);
A46B5/0095 (KR,US);
A46B7/08 (KR,US);
A46B9/04 (KR,US);
A61C17/028 (GB);
A61C17/22 (GB);
A61C17/222 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
A61C17/225 (GB);
A61C17/227 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
A61C17/26 (CN);
A61C17/34 (CN,GB);
A61C17/40 (KR,US);
A46B11/0041 (GB);
A46B11/0055 (GB);
A46B11/0062 (GB);
A46B11/0096 (GB);
A46B2200/1066 (GB,KR);
A46B2200/108 (GB);
A61C17/02 (EP,US);
A61C2204/00 (CN);
A61C2204/002 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/12] | English: | CLEANING APPLIANCE | [2018/12] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 12.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2016 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | ES | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | IE | 25.04.2020 | LU | 25.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.04.2016 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE29703210U (LUETH STEFAN DR [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11,21-25,27-31 * page 2 - page 5; figure 1 * [A] 13-20,33-41 [Y] 6,12,26,32; | [XAYI]US6164967 (SALE DAVID WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,21-25,27-32 * column 3 - column 6; figures 1a, 2, 5a-10 * [A] 13-20,33-41 [Y] 12,32 [I] 6,26; | [YA]US6689078 (REHKEMPER STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 6,26 * column 5, line 14 - line 17 * [A] 1-5,7-25,27-41; | [YA]US2006292521 (HEGEMANN KENNETH J [US]) [Y] 13-20,33-41 * paragraphs [0111] , [0115] , [0128]; figures 17-29A * [A] 1-12,21-32; | [A]JP2007014730 (AMAMIYA MASARU) [A] 1-41* page 2 - page 3; figure 1 *; | [XAY]WO2010055435 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,11,21-23,25,27,28,30,31 * page 2 - page 4; figure 1; claims 1, 2 * [A] 4,6,9,12,24,26,29,32 [Y] 13-20,33-41 |