EP3289359 - ANALYTE DETECTION AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senzo Health Limited 3rd Floor 1 Ashley Road Altrincham, Cheshire WA14 2DT / GB | [2021/29] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states Orphidia Limited 14 Heathfield Gardens London NW11 9HX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RACHAMIM, Aron 14 Heathfield Gardens London NW11 9HX / GB | 02 /
RABY, Jacob 32 Ernest Gardens London W4 3QU / GB | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Richter, Allen Patentanwalt Dr. Kasche Bühlstrasse 1 8125 Zollikerberg/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Richter, Allen Patentanwalt Dr. Kasche Resirain 1 8125 Zollikerberg/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 16719849.8 | 27.04.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016EP59438 | Priority number, date | US201562153523P | 28.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562153523 P | US201562155486P | 01.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562155486 P | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016174106 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289359 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/537, G01N15/00 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/537 (EP,CN,US);
G01N15/0618 (EP,US);
G01N15/1456 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (CN);
G01N21/64 (CN);
G01N21/78 (CN);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
G01N33/5094 (US);
G01N33/56933 (US);
G01N33/56966 (US);
G01N33/56972 (US);
G01N15/0625 (EP,US);
G01N2015/016 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1486 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1488 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00475 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | DETEKTION EINES ANALYTEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/10] | English: | ANALYTE DETECTION AND METHODS THEREFOR | [2018/10] | French: | DÉTECTION DE SUBSTANCES À ANALYSER ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.08.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/01] | 01.06.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/16] | 30.08.2019 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/16] | Cited in | International search | [XI] - Who, "Laboratory Guidelines for enumerating CD4 T Lymphocytes in the context of HIV/AIDS Laboratory Guidelines for enumerating CD4 T Lymphocytes in the context of HIV/AIDS", (20070101), pages 1 - 62, URL: http://www.who.int/hiv/amds/LaboratoryGuideEnumeratingCD4TLymphocytes.pdf, (20160614), XP055280250 [X] 1,16 * (D1, p 28, para 3 and p 30, para 1)(p 18, last para ff);; figure 3.2 * [I] 2-15 | [XI] - Matthew J Tomlinson ET AL, "Cell separation: Terminology and practical considerations", Journal of Tissue Engineering, (20120101), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://tej.sagepub.com/content/4/2041731412472690.full.pdf, (20160614), XP055280278 [X] 17,20 * figure 4 * [I] 18,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/2041731412472690 | [XP] - CHRISTINE I WOSNITZA ET AL, "PAIA assays: A new bead-based assay system for high throughput protein quantification", BMC PROCEEDINGS, London UK, (20150531), vol. 9, no. Suppl 9, doi:10.1186/1753-6561-9-S9-P62, ISSN 1753-6561, page P62, XP055279966 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1753-6561-9-S9-P62 |