EP3285999 - USE OF A FIBRE COMPOSITE MATERIAL HAVING SANDWICH STRUCTURE AND FOAM COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Styrolution Group GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 50 60325 Frankfurt / DE | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIESSNER, Norbert Im Haag 17 67159 Friedelsheim / DE | 02 /
DEITMERG, Philipp Arpe 59 57392 Schmallenberg / DE | 03 /
JAHNKE, Eike Chemin des Clos 12 1180 Aubonne / CH | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 16720075.7 | 22.04.2016 | [2018/09] | WO2016EP59041 | Priority number, date | DE201510207359 | 22.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015207359 | [2018/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016170131 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285999 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/06, B32B5/22, B32B5/24, B32B5/26, B32B7/04, B32B7/08, B32B27/30, B32B7/10, C08J5/08, C08K7/14, C08L33/00, C08L35/00 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,US);
B32B5/06 (EP,US);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B5/22 (EP,US);
B32B5/24 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
B32B7/10 (EP,US);
C08J5/043 (EP,US);
C08J5/08 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (US);
C08K9/02 (US);
C08L33/20 (EP,US);
B32B2250/00 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2260/00 (EP,US);
B32B2260/02 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0228 (EP,US);
B32B2307/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES FASERVERBUND-WERKSTOFFS MIT SANDWICH-STRUKTUR UND SCHAUMSTOFF-KOMPONENTE | [2018/09] | English: | USE OF A FIBRE COMPOSITE MATERIAL HAVING SANDWICH STRUCTURE AND FOAM COMPONENT | [2018/09] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE FIBREUX AYANT UNE STRUCTURE EN SANDWICH ET UN COMPOSANT EN MATIÈRE ALVÉOLAIRE | [2018/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 21.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [T]US5271982 (VERPOEST IGNACE H J M [NL], et al) [T] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, lines 19-2, 44-51; figures 2-2; claims 1-3,,10,16 *; | [T]EP0356930 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [T] 1 * figure 3; claims 1-3,5-10,13,16,18-20 *; | [T]US6743742 (LAROCCO MICHAEL C [US], et al) [T] 1 * column 3, line 14; figures 1,5; claims 1-5, 9 *; | [T]US5482756 (BERGER JEFFREY L [US], et al) [T] 1 * column 3, lines 1-25; figure 1; claims 1,6, 10-12,14-16 *; | [T]DE68915220T (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [T] 1 * page 5 - page 9, line 16; figures 1a,2; claims 1,4 *; | [Y]WO2011023541 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9,15 * page 6, lines 2-33 - page 11, line 8; claims 1, 2,4,5,7-9 * * page 4, lines 20-26 *; | [A]WO2008110539 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,15 * page 10, lines 18-22; claims 1,3-5,7,11 *; | [Y]JP2005146431 ; | [A]EP1923420 (BOND LAMINATES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 43] - [0044]; claims 1-3, 16-17 *; | [Y]DE3324909 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,8,13-16 * page 11, line 1 - page 14, line 9; claim 1 *; | [XY]US2002094427 (EDWARDS CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0 13] , [0 20]; claims 1,4-6, 11, 14, 18 * [Y] 2-12; | [X]US6165604 (EDWARDS CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * example . *; | [X]US2002061968 (YOSHIHARA NORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 17] - [0018] - [0 22] - [0023] - [ 41] - [0045]; example 13A; claims 1-2, 4 *; | [X]EP0700952 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,5,13-15 * examples 1-10; claims 1-2,5 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (2005), vol. 2005, no. 45, Database accession no. 2005-438394, XP002759035 & JP2005146431 A 20050609 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 29] , [0 43] , [0 64] , [0 68] , [0 73] , [0 76]; claims 1, 14-15 * | by applicant | WO2008058971 | WO2008119678 | CN102924857 | CN101555341 | KR100376049B | WO2014163227 | CA2862396 | US2011020572 | DE202010001918U | WO2008110539 | GB1472195 | EP0363608 | - R. GÄCHTER; H. MÜLLER, Taschenbuch der Kunststoffadditive, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1983), pages 494 - 510 | - G. BENZING, Pigmente für Anstrichmittel, EXPERT-VERLAG, (1988), page 78FF |