EP3283584 - A RMA CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED ADHESION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allnex Netherlands B.V. Synthesebaan 1 4612 RB Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEDEGEBUURE, Rien Hoenderweg 25 4697BE Sint-Annaland / NL | 02 /
THYS, Ferry Ludovicus Tennislaan 16 B-1932 Stevens-Woluwe / BE | 03 /
DE WOLF, Elwin Aloysius Cornelius Adrianus Spoorbaan 2 4631 PP Hoogerheide / NL | 04 /
BRINKHUIS, Richard Hendrikus Gerrit Groot Wezenland 33 8011 JX Zwolle / NL | 05 /
GESSNER, Michael Anthony 5116 Macintosh Avenue La Grange, Kentucky 40031 / US | 06 /
BUSER, Antonius Johannes Wilhelmus Beekseweg 41 7031 GN Wehl / NL | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 16720743.0 | 18.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016EP58525 | Priority number, date | US201562148966P | 17.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562148966 P | EP20150169717 | 28.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15169717 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016166369 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283584 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09D167/02, C08J3/24 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
C09D167/02 (EP,CN,US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B05D3/0254 (US);
B05D3/102 (US);
C08G61/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08J3/24 (US);
C08L63/00 (US);
C08L67/02 (US);
C09D163/00 (EP,CN,US);
C09D17/008 (US);
C08G2261/135 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2261/334 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | RMA-KREUZVERBINDBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER HAFTUNG | [2018/08] | English: | A RMA CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED ADHESION | [2018/08] | French: | COMPOSITION RÉTICULABLE PAR RMA MANIFESTANT UNE ADHÉRENCE AMÉLIORÉE | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 05.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005021672 (ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS [US], et al) [X] 21,23 * claims 2,6 * * page 9, lines 14-19 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 2 *; | [A]WO2005104694 (ASHLAND INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * claims 1-4,11,16,18 ** page 13, lines 13-18 *; | [X]EP2072520 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 21,23 * claim - * * example 3; table 1 *; | [AD]WO2014166880 (NUPLEX RESINS BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-26 * claims 1,16 * * tables C,D * | by applicant | EP0326723 | EP2556108 | EP2764035 | WO2014166880 | WO2014EP56953 |