EP3283916 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYSING AN OBJECT, IN PARTICULAR A MICROSCOPIC SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNEBEL, Werner Hebelstrasse 17/1 76709 Kronau / DE | 02 /
SIECKMANN, Frank Frankenstrasse 11 75031 Eppingen / DE | 03 /
FAHRBACH, Florian Cambridgestrasse 8 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16720745.5 | 18.04.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016EP58565 | Priority number, date | LU20150092696 | 17.04.2015 Original published format: LU 92696 | [2018/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016166375 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283916 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/18, G02B21/36 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G02B21/006 (EP,US);
G02B21/0032 (US);
G02B21/18 (EP,US);
G02B21/248 (US);
G02B21/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERSUCHEN EINES OBJEKTES, INSBESONDERE EINER MIKROSKOPISCHEN PROBE | [2018/08] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYSING AN OBJECT, IN PARTICULAR A MICROSCOPIC SAMPLE | [2018/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'UN OBJET, EN PARTICULIER D'UN ÉCHANTILLON MICROSCOPIQUE | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 17.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2021/52] | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004125228 (DOUGHERTY ROBERT [US]) [I] 1,4,5,7-9,13,15,16,19-23,27 * abstract * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE102010049751 (CAESAR STIFTUNG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,13,15,16,19-23,27 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 2,3,17,18; | [Y]WO2013053822 (VENTANA MED SYST INC [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,17,18 * abstract * * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 32, paragraph 3 ** figures 2, 4 * |