EP3274188 - METHOD OF PROVIDING AN IMPRINTED SECURITY FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morpho B.V. Oudeweg 32 2031 CC Haarlem / NL | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BERG, Jan Bloklandpolderstraat 15 2807 LH Gouda / NL | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/05] | Application number, filing date | 16720929.5 | 22.03.2016 | [2018/05] | WO2016NL50197 | Priority number, date | NL20152014520 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: NL 2014520 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016153345 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3274188 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3274188 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/41 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
B42D25/41 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/378 (US);
B42D25/405 (EP,US);
B42D25/425 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES GEPRÄGTEN SICHERHEITSMERKMALS | [2018/05] | English: | METHOD OF PROVIDING AN IMPRINTED SECURITY FEATURE | [2018/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ IMPRIMÉE | [2018/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 25.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.01.2019 | [2022/31] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0219012 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1,9,12 * figure 7 *; | [A]US2006261518 (WILLSON C G [US], et al) [A] 1,9,12* claim 1 *; | [AD]WO2009078881 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [AD] 1,9,12 * figure 2c *; | [A]WO2013028534 (VISUAL PHYSICS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,12 * figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0219012 | US4765656 | EP1874557 | WO2009078881 | US2011149405 | EP2553517 | - MINGATO LI ET AL., "Fabrication of circular optical structures with a 20 nm minimum size using nano-imprint lithography", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 76, no. 6, pages 673 - 675 |